This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2020 at 07:35:15 (UTC).

Round Hill Music, LLC et al v. TuneCore, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 Round Hill Music, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against TuneCore, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas G. Garaufis and Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03466

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G. Garaufis

Referral Judge

Ramon E. Reyes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Round Hill Music, LLC

Round Hill Music LP

Defendants

TuneCore, Inc.

Believe SAS

Believe Digital Holdings Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James M. Thayer

Attorney at Gordon, Gordon & Schnapp, P.C.

30 Broad St, Floor 21

New York, NY 10004-2900

Richard Steven Busch

Attorney at King & Ballow

315 Union Street, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37201

Defendant Attorney

Eleanor Martine Lackman

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

437 Madison Avenue, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Round Hill Music LP, Round Hill Music, LLC. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Steven Busch on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#12

(#12) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Believe Digital Holdings Inc., Believe SAS, TuneCore, Inc.. (Lackman, Eleanor) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Round Hill Music, LLC, Round Hill Music LP. Believe SAS waiver sent on 8/27/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. (Thayer, James) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#10

(#10) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Believe Digital Holdings Inc., Believe SAS, TuneCore, Inc.. (Lackman, Eleanor) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor Martine Lackman on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Lackman, Eleanor) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Round Hill Music, LLC, Round Hill Music LP. TuneCore, Inc. served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Thayer, James) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Round Hill Music, LLC, Round Hill Music LP. Believe Digital Holdings Inc. served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Thayer, James) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

6 #1

complaint

#6

(#6) Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

5 #2

Summons

1 #6

Exhibit Report on the Filing or Determination of an action or appeal regarding c

1 #5

Exhibit Schedule A list of Compositions

1 #4

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Believe SAS

1 #3

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Beleive Digital Holdings

1 #2

Proposed Summons Porposed Summonse for Tunecorp, Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13146291 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Round Hill Music, LLC, Round Hill Music LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Porposed Summonse for Tunecorp, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Beleive Digital Holdings, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Believe SAS, #5 Exhibit Schedule A list of Compositions, #6 Exhibit Report on the Filing or Determination of an action or appeal regarding copyright) (Thayer, James) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer over plaintiffs' opposition #12 . All Defendants answers due 11/25/2020. There will be no additional extensions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/25/2020. (Reyes, Ramon) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER terminating #14 as it is an opposition to #12 and not a motion.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/25/2020. (Reyes, Ramon) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Round Hill Music LP, Round Hill Music, LLC. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Steven Busch on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Believe Digital Holdings Inc., Believe SAS, TuneCore, Inc.. (Lackman, Eleanor) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Round Hill Music, LLC, Round Hill Music LP. Believe SAS waiver sent on 8/27/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. (Thayer, James) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Believe Digital Holdings Inc. answer due 9/25/2020; TuneCore, Inc. answer due 9/25/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/26/2020. (Reyes, Ramon) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Believe Digital Holdings Inc., Believe SAS, TuneCore, Inc.. (Lackman, Eleanor) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor Martine Lackman on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Lackman, Eleanor) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Round Hill Music, LLC, Round Hill Music LP. TuneCore, Inc. served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Thayer, James) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Round Hill Music, LLC, Round Hill Music LP. Believe Digital Holdings Inc. served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Thayer, James) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Believe Digital Holdings Inc., Believe SAS, TuneCore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Round Hill Music LP, Round Hill Music, LLC (Thayer, James) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13146291 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Round Hill Music, LLC, Round Hill Music LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Porposed Summonse for Tunecorp, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Beleive Digital Holdings, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Believe SAS, #5 Exhibit Schedule A list of Compositions, #6 Exhibit Report on the Filing or Determination of an action or appeal regarding copyright) (Thayer, James) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tunecore, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Round Hill Music, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eleanor M. Lackman Esq.