This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 07:23:46 (UTC).

Rottenberg v. TransUnion, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Rottenberg filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against TransUnion, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric R. Komitee and Roanne L. Mann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03854

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric R. Komitee

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Josef Rottenberg

Defendants

TransUnion, LLC

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tamir Saland

Attorney at Stein Saks

One University Plaza, Ste. 620

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Defendant Attorneys

Camille Renee Nicodemus

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Taylor Ann Decker

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Christopher B. Turcotte

Attorney at Turcotte Law, P.C.

575 Madison Avenue, Suite 1006

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

16 #2

Proposed Order

16 #1

Affidavit of Taylor A. Decker

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Josef Rottenberg. (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#14

(#14) Letter to adjourn the initial conference by Josef Rottenberg (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on September 21, 2021 @ noon before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE.Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by 3:00 p.m. on September 17, 2021, 2021. *** To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833.If the parties are initially unable to connect to the call, please try again as the third-party conference call system has been overloaded at times. (LK) Modified to add "noon" on 8/9/2021 (LK). (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Turcotte, Christopher) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#9) Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion, LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Josef Rottenberg. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Josef Rottenberg. TransUnion, LLC served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TransUnion, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of TransUnion, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac V. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/27/2021. (LK) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER terminating #15 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Has previously been granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/27/2021. (LK) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice of MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14791162. by TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Taylor A. Decker, #2 Proposed Order) (Decker, Taylor) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: The telephonic initial conference scheduled for September 21, 2021 is adjourned to October 12, 2021 at noon before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. (LK) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketORDER [DE #15]: Application granted, on consent. The telephonic initial conference scheduled for September 21, 2021 is adjourned to October 12, 2021 at noon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/12/2021. (LK) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Josef Rottenberg. (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketORDER [DE #14]: As plaintiff's application for an adjournment fails to comply with this Court's Individual Rules, it is denied without prejudice. Any renewed request must state the positions of defendants' on the application and must be docketed as an ECF motion event. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/9/2021. (LK) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter to adjourn the initial conference by Josef Rottenberg (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on September 21, 2021 @ noon before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE.Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by 3:00 p.m. on September 17, 2021, 2021. *** To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833.If the parties are initially unable to connect to the call, please try again as the third-party conference call system has been overloaded at times. (LK) Modified to add "noon" on 8/9/2021 (LK). (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Turcotte, Christopher) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion, LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Josef Rottenberg. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Josef Rottenberg. TransUnion, LLC served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TransUnion, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of TransUnion, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Josef Rottenberg against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., TransUnion, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14640356 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Josef Rottenberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Saland, Tamir) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TransUnion Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant