This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2021 at 07:39:42 (UTC).

Rotstein v. Davol, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 Rotstein filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Davol, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02408

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Rotstein

Defendants

Davol, Inc.

Ethicon Inc

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Isaac Rotstein

Attorney at Rotstein & Shiffman, LLP

309 Oakridge Blvd.

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Defendant Attorneys

Edward M. Mullins

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Dr Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

William Darrell Kloss, Jr.

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease - 2

Po Box 1008, 52 E Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43216-1008

Brenda A Sweet

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113-7213

Rita A Maimbourg

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113-7213

Richard McLure Dye

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy, Ste 1400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#21

#19

#18

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Michael Rotstein (Rotstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTATION ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/28/21. (jr) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Michael Rotstein. (Rotstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard McLure Dye for Defendants Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Dye, Richard) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support) (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Short Form ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Davol, Inc.. (Kloss, William) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Ethicon Inc answer due 6/14/2021; Johnson & Johnson answer due 6/14/2021. (daf) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION for Extension to Move or Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A Sweet for Defendants Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Southern District of Ohio. MDL case number: 2846 (ALL) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/11/2021.] (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Davol, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Other Affiliate C.R. Bard, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Davol, Inc... (Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/11/2021.] (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Davol, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/11/2021.] (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Michael Rotstein. Related case(s): No (RDO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/11/2021.] (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (WRONG EVENT CODE. REFILED AT #7 ) NOTICE by Michael Rotstein re #3 Order Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Rotstein, Jonathan) Modified on 4/26/2021 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/11/2021.] (Entered: 04/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Michael Rotstein. (Rotstein, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/11/2021.] (Entered: 04/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2846, In re: Davol, Inc./C.R. Bard, Inc., Polypropylene Hernia Mesh Products Liability Litigation. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 4/22/21, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (RDO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/11/2021.] (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/22/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/11/2021.] (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:21-cv-0710-PGB-EJK. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/11/2021.] (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventh Judicial Circuit, Volusia County, Florida, case number 2021-30362-CICI filed in State Court on 03/18/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18163573 filed by Davol, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Ex. A, #2 State Court Other Documents Ex. B, #3 State Court Other Documents Ex. C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/11/2021.] (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Davol, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard M. Dye