This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2021 at 12:07:08 (UTC).

Rotstein v. Davol, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Rotstein filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Davol, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Embry J. Kidd and Paul G. Byron. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00710

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Rotstein

Defendants

Davol, Inc.

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Isaac Rotstein

Attorney at Rotstein & Shiffman, LLP

309 Oakridge Blvd

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Defendant Attorney

Edward M. Mullins

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Dr Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Southern District of Ohio. MDL case number: 2846 (ALL) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Davol, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Other Affiliate C.R. Bard, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Davol, Inc... (Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Davol, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Michael Rotstein. Related case(s): No (RDO) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#6

(#6) (WRONG EVENT CODE. REFILED AT #7) NOTICE by Michael Rotstein re #3 Order Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Rotstein, Jonathan) Modified on 4/26/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 04/25/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Michael Rotstein. (Rotstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/25/2021)

4 #2

Docket Sheet

4 #1

Complaint

#4

(#4) POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2846, In re: Davol, Inc./C.R. Bard, Inc., Polypropylene Hernia Mesh Products Liability Litigation. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 4/22/21, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (RDO) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#3

(#3) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/22/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 04/22/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

State Court Other Documents Ex. C

1 #2

State Court Other Documents Ex. B

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT Ex. A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventh Judicial Circuit, Volusia County, Florida, case number 2021-30362-CICI filed in State Court on 03/18/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18163573 filed by Davol, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Ex. A, #2 State Court Other Documents Ex. B, #3 State Court Other Documents Ex. C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Southern District of Ohio as case 2:21-cv-02408, filed on 05/11/2021. (ALL) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Southern District of Ohio. MDL case number: 2846 (ALL) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Davol, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Other Affiliate C.R. Bard, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Davol, Inc... (Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Davol, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Michael Rotstein. Related case(s): No (RDO) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (WRONG EVENT CODE. REFILED AT #7) NOTICE by Michael Rotstein re #3 Order Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Rotstein, Jonathan) Modified on 4/26/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 04/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Michael Rotstein. (Rotstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2846, In re: Davol, Inc./C.R. Bard, Inc., Polypropylene Hernia Mesh Products Liability Litigation. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 4/22/21, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (RDO) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/22/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:21-cv-0710-PGB-EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventh Judicial Circuit, Volusia County, Florida, case number 2021-30362-CICI filed in State Court on 03/18/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18163573 filed by Davol, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Ex. A, #2 State Court Other Documents Ex. B, #3 State Court Other Documents Ex. C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Davol, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward M. Mullins