This case was last updated from PACER on 10/30/2021 at 08:37:10 (UTC).

Rothschild v. Great Northern Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Rothschild filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Great Northern Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia G. Cooke and John J. O'Sullivan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-23148

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

Referral Judge

John J. O'Sullivan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leigh Rothschild

Defendant

Great Northern Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Josef Timlichman

3029 Ne 188Th St, Apt 502

Aventura, FL 33180

Edward Joseph Armellino

Attorney at The Armellino Law Group, PLLC

12485 Sw 137Th Ave, Ste 212

Miami, FL 33186

Defendant Attorneys

Evan Michael Holober

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 4410

Miami, FL 33131

John David Dickenson

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

One North Clematis Street, Suite 510

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents

1 #2

Errata 2

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joseph Armellino on behalf of Leigh Rothschild. Attorney Edward Joseph Armellino added to party Leigh Rothschild(pty:pla). (Armellino, Edward) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit B

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: Jury Trial set for 11/7/2022 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Calendar Call set for 11/2/2022 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Amended Pleadings due by 1/28/2022. Expert Discovery due by 5/20/2022. Fact Discovery due by 4/8/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 1/28/2022. Mediation Deadline 7/22/2022. In Limine Motions due by 9/9/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2022. Motions due by 6/3/2022. Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/9/2022. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record to be Noticed by Edward Joseph Armellino for / by Leigh Rothschild. Responses due by 11/12/2021 (Armellino, Edward) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Edward Joseph Armellino representing Rothschild, Leigh (Plaintiff) is hereby withdrawn from the case. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 10/29/2021. (mkr) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record to be Noticed by Edward Joseph Armellino for / by Leigh Rothschild. Responses due by 11/12/2021 (Armellino, Edward) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: Jury Trial set for 11/7/2022 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Calendar Call set for 11/2/2022 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Amended Pleadings due by 1/28/2022. Expert Discovery due by 5/20/2022. Fact Discovery due by 4/8/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 1/28/2022. Mediation Deadline 7/22/2022. In Limine Motions due by 9/9/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2022. Motions due by 6/3/2022. Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/9/2022. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Great Northern Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Dickenson, John) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joseph Armellino on behalf of Leigh Rothschild. Attorney Edward Joseph Armellino added to party Leigh Rothschild(pty:pla). (Armellino, Edward) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Great Northern Insurance Company re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dickenson, John) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (pcs) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $402.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-14972928, payment transferred from : 21-cv-23148 Rothschild v. Great Northern Ins. Co., filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Errata 2)(Dickenson, John) State Court Answer filed. Modified on 8/31/2021 (pcs). (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Great Northern Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan M. Holober

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John David Dickenson