This case was last updated from PACER on 05/15/2021 at 08:01:35 (UTC).

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. VIAAS, Inc.

Case Summary

On March 16, 2021, Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC (“Plaintiff” or “Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems”) represented by Stephen Michael Lobbin of SML Avvocati P.C. filed an intellectual property lawsuit against VIAAS, Inc. (“VIAAS”), seeking injunctive relief, damages among other reliefs for allegedly infringing intellectual property relating to method and apparatus for media content storage and delivery. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Northern District of California with Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff alleged that the Defendant have infringed one or more claims under United States Patent Number 8,856,221 entitled “System and Method for Storing Broadcast Content in a Cloud-Based Computing Environment” (hereinafter the “`221 Patent”) owned by Plaintiff.

 

In its complaint Plaintiff alleged that “Defendant has infringed and continues to infringe one or more claims, including at least Claim 7, of the ‘221 Patent by making, using, importing, selling, and/or offering for media content storage and delivery systems and services covered by one or more claims of the ‘221 Patent.” Plaintiff also alleged that “Defendant sells, offers to sell, and/or uses media content storage and delivery systems and services, including, without limitation, the VIAAS video recording security platform, including any associated apps, software and/or hardware, and any similar products (“Product”), which infringes at least Claim 7 of the ‘221 Patent.”

 

Plaintiff further alleged that “Defendant has committed these acts of literal infringement, or infringement under the doctrine of equivalents of the `221 Patent, without license or authorization. As a result of Defendant’s infringement of the `221 Patent, injured Plaintiff has suffered monetary damages and is entitled to a monetary judgment in an amount adequate to compensate for Defendant’s past infringement, together with interests and costs.” Plaintiff also alleged that “The media data includes date and time information that indicates a length of time to store the requested media content (e.g., a user is allowed to store media content for a retention time period as per their subscription level, which varies from 7 days to 90 days in the cloud). Certain aspects of these elements. Defendant’s actions complained of herein is causing irreparable harm and monetary damage to Plaintiff and will continue to do so unless and until Defendant is enjoined and restrained by this Court.”

 

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff is for the alleged infringement of one or more claims of the ‘221 Patent. 

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order that Defendant has infringed the asserted Patent, enjoining Defendant and all persons in active concert from further infringement. Plaintiff further requested the court to Award Plaintiff damages resulting from Defendants alleged infringement in accordance with 35 U.S.C. § 284 and also award Plaintiff costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents. 

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01848

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC

Defendant

VIAAS, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Michael Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

#1

#19

#17

16 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#16

#15

13 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#13

#11

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

9 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 05/14/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE Re: #11 Declination Filed: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2021) Modified on 5/13/2021 (mklS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for all further proceedings re Notice of Pendency of other Action Involving same patent. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/10/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedingsre #15 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 5/4/2021) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains s referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC.. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/28/2021) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/3/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting (as modified by the Court) #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and for Continuance of Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 09:30 AM.(svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/17/2021) (Entered: 04/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to VIAAS, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/31/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. re #1 Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer,, Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case transferred in Case Number :--., COMPLAINT against VIAAS, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15708791.). Filed byRothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M. Lobbin