This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2021 at 09:10:22 (UTC).

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems LLC v Synology America Corp

Case Summary

On March 12, 2021, Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC (“Plaintiff” or “Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems”) represented by Brian Christopher Holloway of Holloway IP filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Synology America, Corp. (“Synology”) for allegedly infringing Rothschild’s intellectual property relating to System and Method for Storing Broadcast Content in a Cloud-Based Computing Environment. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the  Western District of Washington with Judge James L. Robart presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff alleges that the Defendants have infringed one or more claims under United States Patent Number 8,856,221 entitled “System and Method for Storing Broadcast Content in a Cloud-Based Computing Environment” (the “`221 Patent”) owned by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems. 

 

Plaintiff in its complaint alleged that “Defendant sells, offers to sell, and/or uses media content storage and delivery systems and services, including, without limitation, the Synology surveillance station video monitoring and management platform, and any similar products (“Product”), which infringes at least Claim 7 of the ‘221 Patent. The Product practices a method of storing (e.g., cloud storage) media content (e.g., video, audio, etc.) and delivering requested media content (streaming video) to a consumer device (e.g., mobile device with app).Certain aspects of these elements are illustrated in the screenshots below and/or in those provided in connection with other allegations herein.Defendant has knowledge of its infringement of the `221 Patent, at least as of the service of the present complaint. Accordingly, Defendant has infringed, and continues to infringe, the `221 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271.”

 

Plaintiff further alleged that “Defendant has infringed and continues to infringe one or more claims, including at least Claim 7, of the ‘221 Patent by making, using, importing, selling, and/or offering for media content storage and delivery systems and services covered by one or more claims of the ‘221 Patent. As a result of Defendant’s infringement of the `221 Patent, injured Plaintiff has suffered monetary damages and is entitled to a monetary judgment in an amount adequate to compensate for Defendant’s past infringement, together with interests and costs.”

 

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff is for the alleged infringement of one or more claims of the ‘221 Patent. 

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order that Defendant has in fact infringed the ‘221 Patent, enjoining Defendant from further infringement of United States Patent No. 8,856,221 (or, in the alternative, awarding Plaintiff running royalty from the time judgment going forward). Plaintiff further requested the court to award Plaintiff damages resulting from Defendants alleged infringement in accordance with 35 U.S.C. § 284 along with costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00338

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James L. Robart

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems LLC

Defendants

Synology America Corp.

Synology America Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Christopher Holloway

Attorney at HOLLOWAY INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY

5544 25Th Ave Ne

Seattle, WA 98105

 

Court Documents

#11

#1

#13

#12

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

6 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer is due by 6/10/2021. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Second Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Plaintiff Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems LLC. (Holloway, Brian) Modified title on 5/10/2021 (LH). (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting Parties' #10 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Synology shall respond to the complaint on or before 5/10/2021. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SR) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Plaintiff Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems LLC. (Holloway, Brian) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems LLC (Holloway, Brian) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/24/2021. (SG) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Synology America Corp (LH) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRAECIPE Signature Page re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems LLC (Holloway, Brian) Modified to create linkage on 3/16/2021 (LH). (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems LLC (Holloway, Brian) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions.Corrected signature page must be filed by 3/29/2021. (SG) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRAECIPE Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems LLC (Holloway, Brian) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SG) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketJudge James L. Robart added. (SG) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Synology America Corp. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6997414), filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Holloway, Brian) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synology America Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Christopher Holloway