This case was last updated from PACER on 07/19/2021 at 17:31:23 (UTC).

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Schoology, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Schoology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson Stephen Roman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-04250

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelson Stephen Roman

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC

Counter Claimant and Defendant

SCHOOLOGY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Jay B. Johnson

Attorney at Kizzia Johnson PLLC

1910 Pacific Ave. Suite 13000

Dallas, TX 75180

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Excylyn Janaize Hardin-Smith

Attorney at Fish & Richardson

7 Times Square, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Neil J. McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. (Dallas)

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Plaintiff Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC and Defendant Schoology, Inc., by their respective undersigned counsel, hereby STIPULATE and AGREE as follows: 1. All claims asserted by the Plaintiff in this Action are dismissed with prejudice and all claims asserted by the Defendant in this Action are dismissed without prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii); 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees with respect to the matters dismissed hereby; This Stipulation and Order shall finally resolve the Action between the parties. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/13/2021) (nb) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#19

(#19) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #14 Motion for Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk of Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 14).. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/13/2021) (nb) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#18

(#18) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#17

(#17) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Schoology, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 7/13/2021 (km). (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #12 Counterclaim. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER denying #11 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Excylyn J. Hardin-Smith dated 6/4/2021. The Court reviewed Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference to seek leave to file a motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), (ECF No. 11, dated June 4, 2021), and Plaintiff's opposition (ECF No. 13, dated June 7, 2021). Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference is denied and the pre-motion conference requirement is waived. Defendant is granted leave to file its proposed motion with the following briefing schedule: Defendant's moving papers shall be served (not filed) on or before July 8, 2021; Plaintiff's opposition papers shall be served (not filed) on or before August 9, 2021; Defendant's reply papers shall be served on or before August 24, 2021. All motion documents shall be filed on the reply date, August 24, 2021. The parties shall send two physical courtesy copies to Chambers via mail and one electronic courtesy copy to Chambers via email as the documents are served. The Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 11. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 6/8/2021) (va) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#13

No Description Available

#12

(#16) ANSWER to #12 Counterclaim. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#6

No Description Available

#4

(#4) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Schoology, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Plaintiff Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC and Defendant Schoology, Inc., by their respective undersigned counsel, hereby STIPULATE and AGREE as follows: 1. All claims asserted by the Plaintiff in this Action are dismissed with prejudice and all claims asserted by the Defendant in this Action are dismissed without prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii); 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees with respect to the matters dismissed hereby; This Stipulation and Order shall finally resolve the Action between the parties. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/13/2021) (nb) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #14 Motion for Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk of Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 14).. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/13/2021) (nb) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jay Johnson to RE-FILE Document #17 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Use the event type proposed orders, proposed stipulation and order. (km) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Schoology, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 7/13/2021 (km). (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #12 Counterclaim. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 8/24/2021. Responses due by 8/24/2021. Replies due by 8/24/2021. (va) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER denying #11 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Excylyn J. Hardin-Smith dated 6/4/2021. The Court reviewed Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference to seek leave to file a motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), (ECF No. 11, dated June 4, 2021), and Plaintiff's opposition (ECF No. 13, dated June 7, 2021). Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference is denied and the pre-motion conference requirement is waived. Defendant is granted leave to file its proposed motion with the following briefing schedule: Defendant's moving papers shall be served (not filed) on or before July 8, 2021; Plaintiff's opposition papers shall be served (not filed) on or before August 9, 2021; Defendant's reply papers shall be served on or before August 24, 2021. All motion documents shall be filed on the reply date, August 24, 2021. The parties shall send two physical courtesy copies to Chambers via mail and one electronic courtesy copy to Chambers via email as the documents are served. The Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 11. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 6/8/2021) (va) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24641482. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24641482. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Schoology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Schoology, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Schoology, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SCHOOLOGY, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24528988)Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet).(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Excylyn Janaize Hardin-Smith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J McNabnay