This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2021 at 07:28:55 (UTC).

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Johnson Controls, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Johnson Controls, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00964

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC

Defendant

Johnson Controls, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

D. Bradley Kizzia

Attorney at Kizzia & Johnson PLLC

1910 Pacific Avenue, Suite 13000

Dallas, TX 75201

Jay B. Johnson

Attorney at Kizzia Johnson PLLC

1910 Pacific Avenue, Suite 13000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#8

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Johnson Controls, Inc. served on 9/24/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Johnson Controls, Inc. answer due 12/14/2021. (jc5) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC re #1 Complaint (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Johnson Controls, Inc. (jc5) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jc5) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (jc5) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management, LLC for Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15238573), filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNSON CONTROLS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D Bradley Kizzia

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay Brett Johnson