This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/10/2021 at 08:09:23 (UTC).

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Dialpad, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/11/2020 Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Dialpad, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01040

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC

Defendant

Dialpad, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jay B. Johnson

Attorney at Kizzia Johnson PLLC

1910 Pacific Avenue, Suite 13000

Dallas, TX 75201

D. Bradley Kizzia

Attorney at Kizzia & Johnson PLLC

1910 Pacific Avenue, Suite 13000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Dialpad, Inc.. (am) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Pursuant to the Standing Order regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective December 9,2019, attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco Division must prepare the attached form AO-120 and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event. (am) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Original Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14171593), filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Dialpad, Inc.. (am) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pursuant to the Standing Order regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective December 9,2019, attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco Division must prepare the attached form AO-120 and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event. (am) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Original Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14171593), filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DialPad, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D Bradley Kizzia

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay Brett Johnson