Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 07:12:40 (UTC).

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Blue Jeans Network, Inc.

Case Summary

On April 14, 2021, Plaintiff Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC (“Plaintiff” or “Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems”) represented by Stephen Michael Lobbin of SML Avvocati P.C. filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Blue Jeans Network, Inc. (“BJNI” or “Defendant”) seeking damages & royalty for alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,856,221 (hereinafter the “`221 Patent”). This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California with Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. presiding.

 

The Plaintiff asserted that the United States Patent and Trademark Office (“USPTO”) duly and legally issued the `221 Patent, entitled “System and Method for Storing Broadcast Content in a Cloud-Based Computing Environment” after the USPTO completed a full and fair examination. Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems is currently the owner of the `221 Patent and possesses all rights of recovery under the `221 Patent, including the exclusive right to recover for past, present and future infringement. The Patent teaches a method and apparatus for media content storage and delivery. The present invention solves problems that existed with then-existing media delivery systems, primarily, problem of prior delivery systems is that the customer was charged according to the expenses of the provider rather than the usage of the customer.

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff has alleged “The improvements of the ‘221 Patent and the features recitations in the claims of the ’221 Patent are not those that would be well-understood, routine or conventional to one of ordinary skill in the art at the time of the invention. Accordingly, Defendant has infringed, and continues to infringe, the `221 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271. Upon information and belief, Defendant has infringed and continues to infringe one or more claims, including at least Claim 7, of the ‘221 Patent by making, using, importing, selling, and/or offering for media content storage and delivery systems and services covered by one or more claims of the ‘221 Patent.”

 

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems has further alleged “Defendant sells, offers to sell, and/or uses media content storage and delivery systems and services, including, without limitation, the BlueJeans video conferencing platform, any associated hardware, software and apps, as well as any similar products (“Product”), which infringe at least Claim 7 of the ‘221 Patent.” “Defendant’s actions complained of herein is causing irreparable harm and monetary damage to Plaintiff and will continue to do so unless and until Defendant is enjoined and restrained.”

 

There is one cause of action for relief laid down by the Plaintiffs. The cause of action arises under the patent laws of the United States and, in particular under 35 U.S.C. §§ 271, for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 8,856,221. 

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to enter a judgment for the Plaintiff on stated causes of action and restrain Defendants and associated persons from further infringement of United States Patent No. 8,856,221 (or, in the alternative, awarding Plaintiff running royalty from the time judgment going forward). Additionally, the Court may award any other damages resulting from Defendants infringement in accordance with 35 U.S.C. § 284 and such other equitable relief as the Court may find Plaintiff entitled to under law or equity.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.




Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02685

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC

Defendant

Blue Jeans Network, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Michael Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92037

Austin J. Richardson

Attorney at SML Avvocti P.C.

888 Prospect Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 05/14/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for all further proceedings re Notice o Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Blue Jeans Network, Inc. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

7 #1

Standing Order

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines : Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#5

(#5) Civil Cover Sheet by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC . (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Blue Jeans Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15838823.). Filed byRothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for July 20, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by July 13th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-02685-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.).(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 05/14/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for all further proceedings re Notice o Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docket(#9) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Pers ons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry .) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Blue Jeans Network, Inc. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines : Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Civil Cover Sheet by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC . (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use October 2020 version which can be downloaded from https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Blue Jeans Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15838823.). Filed byRothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Blue Jeans Network, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Austin J Richardson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M. Lobbin