This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2019 at 08:55:19 (UTC).

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Arlo Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Arlo Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01606

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC

Defendant

Arlo Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

R. Eric Hutz

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1201 Market Street, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to November 22, 2019 - filed by Arlo Technologies, Inc.. (Hutz, R.) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint to October 23, 2019 - filed by Arlo Technologies, Inc.. (Hutz, R.) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Arlo Technologies, Inc. served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (lak) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 8,856,221 B2. (lak) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Arlo Technologies, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2718784.) - filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to November 22, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Arlo Technologies, Inc. answer due 11/22/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/23/2019. (nms) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to November 22, 2019 - filed by Arlo Technologies, Inc.. (Hutz, R.) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to October 23, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Arlo Technologies, Inc. answer due 10/23/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/24/2019. (nms) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint to October 23, 2019 - filed by Arlo Technologies, Inc.. (Hutz, R.) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01605-RGA, 1:19-cv-01606-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Arlo Technologies, Inc. served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Arlo Technologies, Inc. on 8/29/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (lak) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 8,856,221 B2. (lak) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Arlo Technologies, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2718784.) - filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arlo Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stamatios Stamoulis