This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2022 at 08:46:54 (UTC).

Roth v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 Roth filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Franklin U. Valderrama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02968

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Franklin U. Valderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Virginia Roth

Defendants

Meta Platforms Inc

Facebook Holdings LLC

Facebook Operations LLC

Facebook Payments Inc

Facebook Technologies LLC

Instagram LLC

Siculus Inc

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Facebook Holdings, LLC

Facebook Operations, LLC

Facebook Payments, Inc.

Facebook Technologies, LLC

Instagram, LLC

Siculus, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter J. Flowers

Attorney at Meyers & Flowers, LLC

225 West Wacker Drive, Suite 1515

Chicago, IL 60606

Clinton Richardson

Attorney at Beasley Allen et al

218 Commerce St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorney

Jacob T. Spencer

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher

1050 Connecticut Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc. by Jacob T. Spencer (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Siculus, Inc. (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Instagram, LLC (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Facebook Technologies, LLC (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Facebook Payments, Inc. (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Facebook Operations, LLC (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Facebook Holdings, LLC (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

9 #3

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Virginia Roth by Clinton Richardson (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Virginia Roth. All Defendants. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Attorney Clinton Richardson's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#4

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Attorney Clinton Richardson's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#3

(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 08/22/2022 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Virginia Roth by Peter J. Flowers (Flowers, Peter) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc. by Jacob T. Spencer (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Siculus, Inc. (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Instagram, LLC (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Facebook Technologies, LLC (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Facebook Payments, Inc. (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Facebook Operations, LLC (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Facebook Holdings, LLC (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. to stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION FOR TRANSFER AND COORDINATION OR CONSOLIDATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1407 (Exhibit A) (Attachments: #1 (Attachment A1-A5), #2 (Attachment A6-A28)) (ph, ) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Virginia Roth by Clinton Richardson (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Virginia Roth. All Defendants. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Attorney Clinton Richardson's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19555394. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 08/22/2022 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Facebook Payments Inc, Facebook Technologies LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Inc, Siculus Inc (khg, ) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (khg, ) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (khg, ) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Virginia Roth by Peter J. Flowers (Flowers, Peter) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Virginia Roth; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19538539. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flowers, Peter) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Siculus, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant