This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:58:06 (UTC).

Roth Grading, Inc. v. Martin Brothers Construction

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Roth Grading, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Martin Brothers Construction. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Carolyn K. Delaney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00336

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Carolyn K. Delaney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roth Grading, Inc.

Roth Grading, Inc. Doing business as Impact Roller Technology, a Nebraska Corporation

Defendant

Martin Brothers Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aaron F. Smeall, NCAED

Attorney at SMITH, SLUSKY LAW FIRM

8712 West Dodge Road, Suite 400

Omaha, NE 68114

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick T. Vint, NCAED

Attorney at Woods, Aitken Law Firm

10250 Regency Circle, Suite 525

Omaha, NE 68114

Todd W. Weidemann, NCAED

Attorney at Woods, Aitken Law Firm

10250 Regency Circle, Suite 525

Omaha, NE 68114

Gregory Alan Meredith

Attorney at Martin Brothers Construction

8801 Folsom Blvd., Suite 260

Sacramento, CA 95826

 

Court Documents

#16

15 #3

VDRP

15 #2

Consent Form

15 #1

Standing Order

#15

#14

13 #1

*Restricted*

#13

#12

#11

#10

#7

6 #6

Exhibit E

6 #3

Exhibit B

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #1

Affidavit of Patrick T. Vint

#6

#5

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER by Martin Brothers Construction. Attorney Meredith, Gregory Alan added.(Meredith, Gregory) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE DIRECTING Attorneys Aaron F. Smeall, Patrick T. Vint, and Todd W. Weidemann to submit Pro Hac Vice Application to Practice in the Eastern District of California. (Sant Agata, S) (Sant Agata, S). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Nebraska; Case Number 8:20-cv-00010. (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase transferred to United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Original electronic file sent. (ADB) [Transferred from ned on 2/13/2020.] (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Plaintiff Roth Grading, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue (Filing No. 11) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Defendant Martin Brothers Construction's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 5) for lack of personal jurisdiction is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (ADB) [Transferred from ned on 2/13/2020.] (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1406 and Motion for Extension of Time by Attorney Aaron F. Smeall on behalf of Plaintiff Roth Grading, Inc..(Smeall, Aaron) [Transferred from ned on 2/13/2020.] (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Patrick T. Vint on behalf of Defendant Martin Brothers Construction.(Vint, Patrick) [Transferred from ned on 2/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#9) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Roth Grading, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS) [Transferred from ned on 2/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#8) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Martin Brothers Construction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS) [Transferred from ned on 2/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INDEX in support of MOTION to Dismiss #5 by Attorney Patrick T. Vint on behalf of Defendant Martin Brothers Construction.(Vint, Patrick) [Transferred from ned on 2/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #5 by Attorney Patrick T. Vint on behalf of Defendant Martin Brothers Construction. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick T. Vint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Vint, Patrick) [Transferred from ned on 2/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Patrick T. Vint on behalf of Defendant Martin Brothers Construction.(Vint, Patrick) [Transferred from ned on 2/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to defendant Martin Brothers Construction YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) [Transferred from ned on 2/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Requested as to Martin Brothers Construction regarding Complaint, #1 . (Smeall, Aaron) [Transferred from ned on 2/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) [Transferred from ned on 2/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Martin Brothers Construction ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4088337), by Attorney Aaron F. Smeall on behalf of Roth Grading, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Martin Brothers Purchase Order)(Smeall, Aaron) [Transferred from ned on 2/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTIN BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron F. Smeall