This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 07:19:27 (UTC).

Roth Grading, Inc. v. Martin Brothers Construction

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 Roth Grading, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Martin Brothers Construction. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael D. Nelson and Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00010

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael D. Nelson

Presiding Judge

Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roth Grading, Inc.

Roth Grading, Inc. doing business as Impact Roller Technology, a Nebraska Corporation

Defendant

Martin Brothers Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aaron F. Smeall

Attorney at SMITH, SLUSKY LAW FIRM

8712 West Dodge Road, Suite 400

Omaha, NE 68114

Defendant Attorneys

Todd W. Weidemann

Attorney at WOODS, AITKEN LAW FIRM - OMAHA

10250 Regency Circle, Suite 525

Omaha, NE 68114

Patrick T. Vint

Attorney at WOODS, AITKEN LAW FIRM - OMAHA

10250 Regency Circle, Suite 525

Omaha, NE 68114

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#7

6 #6

Exhibit E

6 #5

Exhibit D

6 #4

Exhibit C

6 #3

Exhibit B

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #1

Affidavit of Patrick T. Vint

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Exhibit B - Martin Brothers Purchase Order

1 #1

Exhibit A - Contract

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase transferred to United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Original electronic file sent. (ADB) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Plaintiff Roth Grading, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue (Filing No. 11) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Defendant Martin Brothers Construction's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 5) for lack of personal jurisdiction is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (ADB) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1406 and Motion for Extension of Time by Attorney Aaron F. Smeall on behalf of Plaintiff Roth Grading, Inc..(Smeall, Aaron) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Patrick T. Vint on behalf of Defendant Martin Brothers Construction.(Vint, Patrick) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#9) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Roth Grading, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#8) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Martin Brothers Construction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INDEX in support of MOTION to Dismiss #5 by Attorney Patrick T. Vint on behalf of Defendant Martin Brothers Construction.(Vint, Patrick) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #5 by Attorney Patrick T. Vint on behalf of Defendant Martin Brothers Construction. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick T. Vint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Vint, Patrick) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Patrick T. Vint on behalf of Defendant Martin Brothers Construction.(Vint, Patrick) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to defendant Martin Brothers Construction YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Requested as to Martin Brothers Construction regarding Complaint, #1 . (Smeall, Aaron) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Martin Brothers Construction ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4088337), by Attorney Aaron F. Smeall on behalf of Roth Grading, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Martin Brothers Purchase Order)(Smeall, Aaron) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTIN BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION is a litigant