Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2021 at 10:20:28 (UTC).

Rotger v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 Rotger filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel R. Dominguez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01653

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel R. Dominguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Awilda Rotger

Defendants

Hi-Tech Pharmacal Co., Inc.

Apotex Corportion

McKesson Corporation

Granules India, Ltd.

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

Strides Pharma Global Pte. Ltd.

State Medical Supply, Inc.

Heritage Pharma Labs Inc.

Pharma USA, Inc.

ANDA Repository LLC

Apotex, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC

Walgreens Co.

L. Perrigo Co.

Dr. Reddys Laboratories SA

Auro Health LLC

Perrigo Research & Development Company

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., f/k/a Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc

72 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan

Attorney at Quetglas Law Office PSC

1353 Luis Vigoreaux Ave., Pmb 669

Guaynabo, PR 00966

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-45) received from the Southern District of Florida re: MDL # 2924. (gav) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

4 #2

Tag along actions

4 #1

Notice of Electronic Filing

#4

(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-45) FINALIZED for the transfer of this case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL # 2924. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel John W. Nichols on 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Electronic Filing, #2 Notice of Electronic Filing) (gav) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION to transfer case filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Category Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7092202.), filed by Awilda Rotger. Service due by 2/17/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCase transferred out to the Southern District of Florida through the extract civil case utility, sending e-mail to CMECF_CaseTransfers@flsd.uscourts.gov. (gav) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-45) received from the Southern District of Florida re: MDL # 2924. (gav) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-45) FINALIZED for the transfer of this case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL # 2924. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel John W. Nichols on 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Electronic Filing, #2 Notice of Electronic Filing) (gav) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to transfer case filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7092202.), filed by Awilda Rotger. Service due by 2/17/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Medical Supply, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Pharma USA, Inc. is a litigant