This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:55:21 (UTC).

Rostchild v. MDOC et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Rostchild filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against MDOC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Louis Guirola, Jr and Robert P. Myers, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00264

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louis Guirola, Jr

Referral Judge

Robert P. Myers, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laderrick O'Neal Rostchild

Pascagoula, MS 39581

Defendants

MDOC

Moss Point Police Dept.

State of Mississippi

Interested Party

Pro Se Department

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #4 Order Opsp8, #3 Order Opsp2. Mail sent to Laderrick O'Neal Rostchild (RLW) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER: on or before 10/21/2020, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 9/21/20. (RLW) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 10/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 9/21/20. (RLW) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

1 #3

Notice of Assignment

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MDOC, Moss Point Police Dept., State of Mississippi, filed by Laderrick O'Neal Rostchild (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment) (RLW) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #4 Order Opsp8, #3 Order Opsp2. Mail sent to Laderrick O'Neal Rostchild (RLW) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: on or before 10/21/2020, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 9/21/20. (RLW) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 10/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 9/21/20. (RLW) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Laderrick O'Neal Rostchild (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MDOC, Moss Point Police Dept., State of Mississippi, filed by Laderrick O'Neal Rostchild (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment) (RLW) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less