This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2021 at 10:01:26 (UTC).

Rossow v. P.A.M. Transport Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Rossow filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against P A M Transport Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is G Murray Snow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-08202

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

G Murray Snow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jordan Carlyle Rossow

Defendants

P.A.M. Transport Incorporated

PAM Carriage Carriers LLC

PAM Trucking Incorporated

Teddryck William Jones

Unknown Jones

Unknown Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abdoukadir Abdul Jaiteh

Elizabeth Marie Gonzalez

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Bruce Baltierra

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit

#2

#3

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Teddryck William Jones, P.A.M. Transport Incorporated.(Baltierra, Matthew) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#5

(#5) DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Teddryck William Jones, P.A.M. Transport Incorporated. (Baltierra, Matthew) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for December 2, 2021 at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 303, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2118. The Clerk of the Court shall send copies of this Order to all counsel of record and to any parties appearing in propria persona. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 9/27/2021. (WLP) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jordan Carlyle Rossow. (Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Teddryck William Jones, P.A.M. Transport Incorporated. (Baltierra, Matthew) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#9

(#9) First NOTICE of Deposition of Jordan Carlyle Rossow, filed by Teddryck William Jones, P.A.M. Transport Incorporated. (Baltierra, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendants show cause in writing on or before November 12, 2021, why they should not be sanctioned or be held in contempt of court pursuant to Title 18 U.S.C. 401 for failing to comply Rule 3.7(b) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. If the parties comply with Rule 3.7(b) on or before November 10, 2021, by either consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction or electing to have the case assigned to a District Judge, the undersigned will automatically vacate this Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 11/08/2021. (REK) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER vacating the Order Setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference #6 . FURTHER ORDERED setting a Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2022 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Plaintiff's counsel shall set up a call-in number and include the information in the joint report due a week before the scheduling conference. See attached Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/10/2021. (KFZ) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER vacating the Order Setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference #6 . FURTHER ORDERED setting a Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2022 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Plaintiff's counsel shall set up a call-in number and include the information in the joint report due a week before the scheduling conference. See attached Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/10/2021. (KFZ) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2021

Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G. Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-8202-PCT-GMS. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause deadline is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021

Docket(#12) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendants show cause in writing on or before November 12, 2021, why they should not be sanctioned or be held in contempt of court pursuant to Title 18 U.S.C. 401 for failing to comply Rule 3.7(b) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. If the parties comply with Rule 3.7(b) on or before November 10, 2021, by either consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction or electing to have the case assigned to a District Judge, the undersigned will automatically vacate this Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 11/08/2021. (REK) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) First NOTICE of Deposition of Jordan Carlyle Rossow, filed by Teddryck William Jones, P.A.M. Transport Incorporated. (Baltierra, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Teddryck William Jones, P.A.M. Transport Incorporated. (Baltierra, Matthew) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jordan Carlyle Rossow. (Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for December 2, 2021 at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 303, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2118. The Clerk of the Court shall send copies of this Order to all counsel of record and to any parties appearing in propria persona. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 9/27/2021. (WLP) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Teddryck William Jones, P.A.M. Transport Incorporated. (Baltierra, Matthew) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Teddryck William Jones, P.A.M. Transport Incorporated.(Baltierra, Matthew) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19867286. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-08202-PCT-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (SCA) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by P.A.M. Transport Incorporated. (Baltierra, Matthew) (SCA) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Coconino County Superior Court, case number S-300-CV-202100393. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19867286 filed by P.A.M. Transport Incorporated, Teddryck William Jones. (Baltierra, Matthew) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(SCA) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less