This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2021 at 12:49:39 (UTC).

Rossman v. Nashoba Regional School District et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 Rossman filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Nashoba Regional School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine A. Robertson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-40042

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine A. Robertson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Rossman

Defendants

Brooke Clenchy

Laura Friend

Nashoba Regional School District

Ann Marie Stoica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott K. Semple

Defendant Attorneys

Hunter S. Keil

Nancy Frankel Pelletier

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit Category Form

#2

#3

#8

#10

#11

#13

#15

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Deborah Rossman. Amended Complaint. (Semple, Scott) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting Parties Assented to #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Responsive Pleading and/or Motion to Dismiss. Brooke Clenchy answer due 6/11/2021; Laura Friend answer due 6/11/2021; Nashoba Regional School District answer due 6/11/2021; Ann Marie Stoica answer due 6/11/2021. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/11/2021 to File Answer Responsive Pleading and/or Motion to Dismiss by Brooke Clenchy, Laura Friend, Nashoba Regional School District, Ann Marie Stoica.(Keil, Hunter) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting the Defendants' Joint #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/Responsive Pleading and/or Motion to Dismiss. Brooke Clenchy answer due 6/3/2021; Laura Friend answer due 6/3/2021; Nashoba Regional School District answer due 6/3/2021; Ann Marie Stoica answer due 6/3/2021. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 3, 2021 to File Answer Responsive Pleading and/or Motion to Dismiss by Brooke Clenchy, Laura Friend, Nashoba Regional School District, Ann Marie Stoica.(Keil, Hunter) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATE COURT Record Brooke Clenchy summons served on 4/6/2021, answer due 5/20/2021; Laura Friend summons served on 4/6/2021, answer due 5/20/2021; Nashoba Regional School District summons served on 4/6/2021, answer due 5/20/2021; Ann Marie Stoica summons served on 4/6/2021, answer due 5/20/2021.. (Pelletier, Nancy) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting the Defendants' Assented to #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the complaint (complaint filed in state court) and/or motion to dismiss. Brooke Clenchy answer due 5/20/2021; Laura Friend answer due 5/20/2021; Nashoba Regional School District answer due 5/20/2021; Ann Marie Stoica answer due 5/20/2021. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 20, 2021 to File Answer Responsive Pleading and/or a Motion to Dismiss by Brooke Clenchy, Laura Friend, Nashoba Regional School District, Ann Marie Stoica.(Pelletier, Nancy) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket(#7) Remark: A Certified copy of the Notice of Removal has been emailed today to Defendants Counsel for service on the State Court in order to obtain the certified State Court record. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from Central Division (Worcester) on 4/23/2021 Case Number 4:21-cv-40042. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield). (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter S. Keil on behalf of Brooke Clenchy, Laura Friend, Nashoba Regional School District, Ann Marie Stoica (Keil, Hunter) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Frankel Pelletier on behalf of Brooke Clenchy, Laura Friend, Nashoba Regional School District, Ann Marie Stoica (Pelletier, Nancy) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brooke Clenchy, Laura Friend, Nashoba Regional School District, Ann Marie Stoica ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8739695 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit Category Form)(Pelletier, Nancy) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less