This case was last updated from PACER on 03/11/2019 at 07:54:28 (UTC).

Rossi, Scott v. Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 Rossi, Scott filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00023

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Rossi

Defendants

Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC

Rausch Sturm LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Briane F. Pagel, Jr.

Attorney at Lawton & Cates, S.C.

345 W. Washington Ave. Ste. 201

Madison, WI 53703

Defendant Attorneys

Manuel H Newburger

Attorney at Barron & Newburger, P.C.

7320 N. Mopac Expy., Ste 400

Austin, TX 78731

Morgan Ian Marcus

Attorney at Sessions, Fishman, Nathan & Israel LLC

141 W. Jackson Blvd. Suite 3550

Chicago, IL 60604

Andrew Edward Cunningham

Attorney at Sessions, Fishman, Nathan & Israel LLC

141 W. Jackson Blvd., Suite 3550

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Notice by Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC . (Newburger, Manuel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

15 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Terms and Conditions

#15

(#15) ANSWER by Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Terms and Conditions) (Newburger, Manuel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#14

(#14) Notice of Appearance filed by Manuel H Newburger for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Newburger, Manuel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#13

(#13) Notice by Defendant Rausch Sturm LLP Pursuant to Rule 5.1. (Newburger, Manuel) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER by Defendant Rausch Sturm LLP. (Newburger, Manuel) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Rausch Sturm LLP. (Newburger, Manuel) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Manuel H Newburger for Defendant Rausch Sturm LLP. (Newburger, Manuel) Modified on 2/19/2019: Caption missing Western District of Wisconsin. (lak) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Marcus, Morgan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#7

(#7) Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Marcus, Morgan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Morgan Ian Marcus for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Marcus, Morgan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew Edward Cunningham for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Cunningham, Andrew) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC and Rausch Sturm LLP. (jls) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Scott Rossi. (Pagel, Briane) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2391114.), filed by Scott Rossi. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pagel, Briane) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Notice by Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC . (Newburger, Manuel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Newburger, Manuel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER by Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Terms and Conditions) (Newburger, Manuel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Notice of Appearance filed by Manuel H Newburger for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Newburger, Manuel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice by Defendant Rausch Sturm LLP Pursuant to Rule 5.1. (Newburger, Manuel) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER by Defendant Rausch Sturm LLP. (Newburger, Manuel) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Rausch Sturm LLP. (Newburger, Manuel) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Manuel H Newburger for Defendant Rausch Sturm LLP. (Newburger, Manuel) Modified on 2/19/2019: Caption missing Western District of Wisconsin. (lak) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Jefferson Capital System, LLC answer due 3/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/14/2019. (jls) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Marcus, Morgan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Marcus, Morgan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Morgan Ian Marcus for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Marcus, Morgan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew Edward Cunningham for Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Cunningham, Andrew) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC and Rausch Sturm LLP. (jls) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Scott Rossi. (Pagel, Briane) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Scott Rossi. (Pagel, Briane) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2391114.), filed by Scott Rossi. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pagel, Briane) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.