This case was last updated from PACER on 07/31/2020 at 10:41:20 (UTC).

Ross v. Yacowitz

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Ross filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Yacowitz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Janet Bond Arterton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01084

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet Bond Arterton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric R Ross

Defendant

Richard Yacowitz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary Scott Klein

Attorney at Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - STMFD

707 Summer Street 3Rd Floor, Suite 300

Stamford, CT 06901-1026

Amanda C. Nugent

Attorney at Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - NH

195 Church St. 18Th Floor, Po Box 1950

New Haven, CT 06509-1950

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Scott Klein on behalf of Eric R Ross (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Eric R Ross, #1 Complaint filed by Eric R Ross, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 07/30/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 07/30/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 07/30/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/28/2020 Discovery due by 1/29/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 3/5/2021 Signed by Clerk on 07/30/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda C. Nugent on behalf of Eric R Ross (Nugent, Amanda) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Richard Yacowitz ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6005013.), filed by Eric R Ross.(Nugent, Amanda) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Scott Klein on behalf of Eric R Ross (Klein, Gary) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Richard Yacowitz. (Nugent, Amanda) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Eric R Ross, #1 Complaint filed by Eric R Ross, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 07/30/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 07/30/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 07/30/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/28/2020 Discovery due by 1/29/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 3/5/2021 Signed by Clerk on 07/30/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketJudge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda C. Nugent on behalf of Eric R Ross (Nugent, Amanda) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Richard Yacowitz ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6005013.), filed by Eric R Ross.(Nugent, Amanda) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less