This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2021 at 09:17:15 (UTC).

Ross v. Synergy Marine PTE LTD et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 Ross filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Synergy Marine PTE LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher L. Ray and R. Stan Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

Presiding Judge

R. Stan Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dillard Ross

Petitioner

Ceres Marine Terminals Inc.

Defendants

Synergy Marine PTE LTD

Synergy Maritime PVT LTD

Argosy PTE LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zachary R. Sprouse

Attorney at Savage, Turner, Durham, Pinckney & Savage

102 E. Liberty Street, 8Th Floor, P.O. Box 10600

Savannah, GA 31412

Petitioner Attorney

Mason White

Attorney at Brennan, Harris & Rominger, LLP

P.O. Box 2784

Savannah, GA 31402-2784

Defendant Attorney

Colin A. McRae

Attorney at HunterMaclean, PC

P.O. Box 9848

Savannah, GA 31412-0048

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Intervene. Ceres Marine Terminals, Inc. is directed to file its intervention Complaint within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/12/21. (wwp) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#9

(#9) RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/17/21. (wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#19

(#19) RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Intervene Plaintiff's Response to Ceres Marine Terminals, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene filed by Dillard Ross. (Sprouse, Zachary) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting re #17 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/30/21. (loh) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2021. Discovery due by 5/3/2021. Motions due by 9/28/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 6/30/2021. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 7/30/2021. Status Report due by 9/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/13/2021. (ca) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#7

(#7) Statement Enumerating Motions pending in case within State Court at the Time of Removal by Argosy PTE LTD, Synergy Marine PTE LTD, Synergy Maritime PVT LTD. (wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#6

(#6) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Argosy PTE LTD. (wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#4

(#4) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Synergy Marine PTE LTD. (wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Argosy PTE LTD, Synergy Marine PTE LTD, Synergy Maritime PVT LTD. (wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE to attorney's of Removal by Argosy PTE LTD, Synergy Marine PTE LTD, Synergy Maritime PVT LTD. (wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Intervention complaint Compliance due by 6/11/2021. (wwp) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Intervene. Ceres Marine Terminals, Inc. is directed to file its intervention Complaint within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/12/21. (wwp) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Intervene Plaintiff's Response to Ceres Marine Terminals, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene filed by Dillard Ross. (Sprouse, Zachary) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/2/2021. Discovery due by 6/17/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 7/30/2021. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 8/29/2021. Motions due by 10/28/2021. Status Report due by 10/13/2021. (loh) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting re #17 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/30/21. (loh) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Synergy Marine PTE LTD. Responses due by 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Scheduling Order)(McRae, Colin) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Intervene and Notice of Subrogation Lien by Ceres Marine Terminals Inc.. Responses due by 5/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(White, Mason) Modified on 4/28/2021 (slt). (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2021. Discovery due by 5/3/2021. Motions due by 9/28/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 6/30/2021. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 7/30/2021. Status Report due by 9/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/13/2021. (ca) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (JH) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McRae, Colin) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE to all counsel of record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Argosy PTE LTD answer due 3/24/2021; Synergy Marine PTE LTD answer due 3/24/2021; Synergy Maritime PVT LTD answer due 3/24/2021. Attorney Appearance Compliance due by 3/27/2021. (wwp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2021: #1 Flattened PDF) (pts). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2021: #2 Correct Document) (pts). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/17/21. (wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docket(#8) Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement Enumerating Motions pending in case within State Court at the Time of Removal by Argosy PTE LTD, Synergy Marine PTE LTD, Synergy Maritime PVT LTD. (wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Argosy PTE LTD. (wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Synergy Maritime PVT LTD. (wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Synergy Marine PTE LTD. (wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Argosy PTE LTD, Synergy Marine PTE LTD, Synergy Maritime PVT LTD. (wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE to attorney's of Removal by Argosy PTE LTD, Synergy Marine PTE LTD, Synergy Maritime PVT LTD. (wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Synergy Maritime PVT LTD, Argosy PTE LTD, Synergy Marine PTE LTD from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV21-00013. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC - 3062700), filed by Synergy Maritime PVT LTD, Argosy PTE LTD, Synergy Marine PTE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Judgment, #2 Exhibit B State Summons, State Complaint, #3 Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk, #4 Notice of Removal to State Court Judges, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CERES MARINE TERMINALS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mason White