This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:21:42 (UTC).

Ross v. Robinson et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Ross filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Robinson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen McMahon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07947

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen McMahon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Geoviny Roy Ross

Marcy, NY 13403-3600

Defendants

Donald Trump

Nicole Robinson

Amy Robinson Ballina

Hillary Clinton

Sallino Barns

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 9/27/2019. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 9/27/2019. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 9/27/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/28/2019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IFP application, #2 Exhibit prisoner authorization)(asg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. By order dated August 28, 2019, the Court directed Plaintiff, within thirty days, to submit a completed request to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP application") and prisoner authorization or pay the $400.00 in fees required to file a civil action in this Court. That order specified that failure to comply would result in dismissal of the complaint. Plaintiff has not filed an IFP application and prisoner authorization or paid the fee. Accordingly, the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1914, 1915. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/3/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/03/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit IFP application

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Amy Robinson Ballina, Sallino Barns, Hillary Clinton, Nicole Robinson, Donald Trump. Document filed by Mark Geoviny Roy Ross.(rdz) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#4

(#4) CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to submit a completed request to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP application") and prisoner authorization or pay the $400.00 in filing fees. See 28 U.S.C. 1914, 1915. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/3/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/03/2019)

2 #2

Exhibit prisoner authorization

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #4 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), #3 Order of Dismissal, Notice of Appeal Forms, to Mark Geoviny Roy Ross 16-A-4980 Marcy Correctional Facility P.O. Box 3600 Marcy, NY 13403-3600. (vba) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to submit a completed request to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP application") and prisoner authorization or pay the $400.00 in filing fees. See 28 U.S.C. 1914, 1915. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/3/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. By order dated August 28, 2019, the Court directed Plaintiff, within thirty days, to submit a completed request to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP application") and prisoner authorization or pay the $400.00 in fees required to file a civil action in this Court. That order specified that failure to comply would result in dismissal of the complaint. Plaintiff has not filed an IFP application and prisoner authorization or paid the fee. Accordingly, the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1914, 1915. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/3/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization, to Mark Geoviny Roy Ross 16-A-4980 Marcy Correctional Facility P.O. Box 3600 Marcy, NY 13403-3600. (vba) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 9/27/2019. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 9/27/2019. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 9/27/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/28/2019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IFP application, #2 Exhibit prisoner authorization)(asg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Amy Robinson Ballina, Sallino Barns, Hillary Clinton, Nicole Robinson, Donald Trump. Document filed by Mark Geoviny Roy Ross.(rdz) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.