This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2022 at 09:06:39 (UTC).

Ross v. Kansas City Royals Baseball Club, LLC

Case Summary

On July 19, 2022, Cleitus Ross (“Plaintiff”), represented by Anthony L. Gosserand of Van Osdol PC, filed a civil rights lawsuit against Kansas City Royals Baseball Club, LLC (“Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief and damages for alleged employment discrimination faced by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan, with Judge Lajuana M. Counts presiding. 

In the complaint states, “Ross is an African American male, was and is a member of a protected group under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964.”

The plaintiff claimed, “During the course of Ross’ employment with the Royals, Ross was subjected to intentional discrimination against him, based on his race, in violation of Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964.”

The plaintiff also claimed, “The unlawful conduct had the purpose and effect of unreasonably interfering with Ross’ work performance, thereby, creating an intimidating, hostile and offensive working environment.

The plaintiff further claimed, “Senior management of the Royals knew, or should have known, of the race discrimination against Ross described herein, but failed to take appropriate remedial action.”

The plaintiff alleged, “By failing to conduct an honest investigation of Ross’ alleged acts or omissions prior to his termination by the Royals, the Royals exacerbated the race discrimination being perpetrated against Ross and exacerbated the hostile work environment being suffered by Ross.“

The plaintiff further alleged, “The Royals failed to properly train or otherwise adequately inform their supervisors, officers and employees concerning the duties and obligations under civil rights laws, including Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “As a result of the Royals’ unlawful conduct and Ross’ racially hostile work environment, Ross has been deprived of and will continue to suffer economic and non-economic damages.”

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “As pled in the foregoing, the Royals engaged in unlawful conduct and discriminated against Ross and created a racially hostile work environment on the basis of his race with malice or reckless indifference to the federally protected rights of Ross.”

The plaintiff alleged, “As a further direct and proximate result of the Royals’ actions, Ross has suffered mental anguish, emotional pain, suffering and distress, embarrassment, humiliation, inconvenience, loss of enjoyment of life and related compensatory damages.”

The plaintiff listed two claims for relief including allegations regarding a racially hostile work environment and discrimination based on race. 

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested a judgment seeking declaratory relief and an award for economic, compensatory, and punitive damages, along with reasonable attorneys’ fees, costs, and expenses. 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00455

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lajuana M. Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cleitus Ross

Defendant

Kansas City Royals Baseball Club, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony Landery Gosserand

Attorney at Van Osdol PC

1600 Genessee Street, Suite 246

Kansas City, MO 64102

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

MAP General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Crocker, Susan) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to : All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 8/9/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Crocker, Susan) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kansas City Royals Baseball Club, LLC filed by Anthony Landery Gosserand on behalf of Cleitus Ross. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8023436. Service due by 10/17/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gosserand, Anthony) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less