This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/25/2022 at 08:40:08 (UTC).

ROSS v. AUROBINDO PHARMA, LTD. et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 ROSS filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against AUROBINDO PHARMA, LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert B. Kugler and Sharon A. King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02387

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Kugler

Referral Judge

Sharon A. King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUDITH ROSS

Defendants

AUROBINDO PHARMA, LTD.

MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.

MYLAN N.V.

ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.

AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC

MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.

HUAHAI U.S. INC.

SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S., LLC

OptumRx

PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL INC.

JOHN DOE

In Re

VALSARTAN LOSARTAN AND IRBESARTAN PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL A. NIGH

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDCNJ BAR

316 S. Baylen, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA, LTD., AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC, HUAHAI U.S. INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., OPTUMRX, PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S., LLC, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bda) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketMember Case Direct File on 4/26/2022, for MDL 2875 VALSARTAN LOSARTAN AND IRBESARTAN PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (bda) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketFor all Case Management Orders #click here (bda) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA, LTD., AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC, HUAHAI U.S. INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., OPTUMRX, PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S., LLC, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bda) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA, LTD., AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC, JOHN DOE, HUAHAI U.S. INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., OptumRx, PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S., LLC, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13363235) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JUDITH ROSS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(NIGH, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aurolife Pharma, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VALSARTAN LOSARTAN AND IRBESARTAN PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL, CO., LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where MYLAN INC is a litigant