Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 12:27:56 (UTC).

Ross v. Alltel Corporation d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 Ross filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Alltel Corporation d/b/a Verizon Wireless. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Thomas L. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02270

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nikita Ross

Defendants

Alltel Corporation d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Alltel Corporation

Not Classified By Court

Clerk and Master W. Aaron Hall

140 Adams Ave., Room 608

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth Margolis

Attorney at KENNETH MARGOLIS, ATTORNEY

22 North Front Street, Suite 760

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

Sally Foster Barron

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

999 Shady Grove, Ste 110

Memphis, TN 38120

Craig A. Cowart

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS LLP - Memphis

999 Shady Grove Road, Suite 110

Memphis, TN 38120

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE by Alltel Corporation of Mediator Selection (Barron, Sally) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 05/27/2020. (kah) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#11

(#11) SETTING LETTER: Civil Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#9

(#9) SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 5/26/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Please call 877-336-1839 to dial into the conference call. The access code is 6517215. (jpw) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alltel Corporation. (Barron, Sally) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Alltel Corporation.(Barron, Sally) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A. Cowart on behalf of Alltel Corporation d/b/a Verizon Wireless (Cowart, Craig) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#2

(#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. 4/10/2020 (jld). (Entered: 04/10/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - State Court Filing

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alltel Corporation d/b/a Verizon Wireless from Chancery Court for Shelby County Tennessee, case number CH-20-0358-2 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3324828), filed by Alltel Corporation d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Filing, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Barron, Sally) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by Alltel Corporation of Mediator Selection (Barron, Sally) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 05/27/2020. (kah) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SETTING LETTER: Civil Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker; Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/26/2020. Kenneth Margolis appeared for the Plaintiff. Sally Barron appeared for the Defendant. The Court adopted the parties Proposed Scheduling Order. Civil Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (Court Reporter, Catherine Phillips) (mlk) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 5/26/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Please call 877-336-1839 to dial into the conference call. The access code is 6517215. (jpw) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alltel Corporation. (Barron, Sally) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Alltel Corporation.(Barron, Sally) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A. Cowart on behalf of Alltel Corporation d/b/a Verizon Wireless (Cowart, Craig) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. 4/10/2020 (jld). (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alltel Corporation d/b/a Verizon Wireless from Chancery Court for Shelby County Tennessee, case number CH-20-0358-2 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3324828), filed by Alltel Corporation d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Filing, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Barron, Sally) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alltel Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Clerk and Master W. Aaron Hall is a litigant