This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/13/2020 at 08:15:10 (UTC).

Ross Marine LLC v. S/V Airways et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Ross Marine LLC filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against S/V Airways. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Norton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00721

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Norton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Ross Marine LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Thomas A Morelli, III

S/V Airways

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

William A Scott

Attorney at Pedersen and Scott

775 Saint Andrews Boulevard

Charleston, SC 29407

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Edward R Corvey, III

Attorney at Kidd Corvey & Simpson

914 Folly Road, Suite B

Charleston, SC 29412

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A Morelli, III, S/V Airways re #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Corvey, Edward) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#10

(#10) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thomas A Morelli, III, S/V Airways.(Corvey, Edward) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Ross Marine LLC by Thomas A Morelli, III.(Corvey, Edward) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Ross Marine LLC by S/V Airways.(Corvey, Edward) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#7

(#7) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Ross Marine LLC. Thomas A Morelli, III served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Scott, William) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/26/2020) (jbry, ). Modified on 2/26/2020 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ). (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ross Marine LLC. Thomas A Morelli, III served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Scott, William) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ross Marine LLC. S/V Airways served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Scott, William) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/21/2020) (jbry, ). Modified on 2/21/2020 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ). (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, ) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ross Marine LLC.(jbry, ) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8945194.), filed by Ross Marine LLC. Service due by 5/13/2020(jbry, ) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A Morelli, III, S/V Airways re #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Corvey, Edward) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thomas A Morelli, III, S/V Airways.(Corvey, Edward) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Ross Marine LLC by Thomas A Morelli, III.(Corvey, Edward) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Ross Marine LLC by S/V Airways.(Corvey, Edward) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Ross Marine LLC. Thomas A Morelli, III served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Scott, William) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/26/2020) (jbry, ). Modified on 2/26/2020 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ). (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ross Marine LLC. Thomas A Morelli, III served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Scott, William) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ross Marine LLC. S/V Airways served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Scott, William) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/21/2020) (jbry, ). Modified on 2/21/2020 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ). (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, ) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ross Marine LLC.(jbry, ) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8945194.), filed by Ross Marine LLC. Service due by 5/13/2020(jbry, ) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less