This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/15/2019 at 08:18:56 (UTC).

Ross Group Construction Corporation, The v. RCO Construction, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 Ross Group Construction Corporation, The filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RCO Construction, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00551

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ross Group Construction Corporation, The

Defendants

RCO Construction, LLC

Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Edward Harper, Jr

Attorney at Barrow & Grimm PC

110 W 7Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119-1044

Timothy Lee Rogers

Attorney at Barrow & Grimm PC

110 W 7Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119-1044

Defendant Attorney

Ryan Dodson Dry

Attorney at Krebs Farley & Dry, PLLC

909 18Th Street

Plano, TX 75074

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

12 #1

Exhibit A

#15

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company) by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Dry, Ryan) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • (#14) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this is a two-part motion of which only one part was efiled; Correction: efiled Motion to Transfer Case to Other District - see 13 (Re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memo in Support ) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District (submitted as part of #12 ) by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memo in Support by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Ryan Dodson Dry added to party Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(pty:dft).] (With attachments) (Dry, Ryan) Modified on 12/4/2019; this is a two-part motion of which only one part was efiled - see 13 for Motion to Transfer Case to Other District (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: RCO Construction, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: RCO Construction, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Rogers, Timothy) Modified on 10/29/2019 - ENTERED IN ERROR - wrong PDF attached - counsel refiled document(sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, RCO Construction, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Harper, John) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, RCO Construction, LLC (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Ross Group Construction Corporation, The to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy Lee Rogers on behalf of Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Rogers, Timothy) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Edward Harper, Jr on behalf of Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Harper, John) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, RCO Construction, LLC (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2123572) by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Harper, John) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ross Group Construction Corporation, The (Harper, John) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ross Group Construction Corporation, The is a litigant

Latest cases where Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan D. Dry