This case was last updated from PACER on 10/30/2020 at 09:47:12 (UTC).

Rosner v. Saul

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 Rosner filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn Adelman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01346

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn Adelman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dale R. Rosner

Defendant

Andrew M Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald J Chewning

Defendant Attorneys

Social Security Administration

Attorney at United States Social Security Administration

600 W Madison St - 6Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60661-2474

Brian E Pawlak

Attorney at United States Department of Justice (ED-WI)

517 E Wisconsin Ave - Rm 530

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Megan C Hugo

Attorney at Social Security Administration

600 W Madison St - 6Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60661-2474

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/22/20 that the defendant file the certified administrative record by December 21, 2020; plaintiff file his opening brief by February 1, 2021; defendant file his response brief by March 15, 2021; and plaintiff file any reply brief by March 30, 2021. (cc: all counsel)(jad)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/9/20 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel) (jad)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/22/20 that the defendant file the certified administrative record by December 21, 2020; plaintiff file his opening brief by February 1, 2021; defendant file his response brief by March 15, 2021; and plaintiff file any reply brief by March 30, 2021. (cc: all counsel)(jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on September 21, 2020. (amb) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on September 21, 2020. (amb) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C Hugo on behalf of Andrew M Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Megan C. Hugo (Hugo, Megan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketTransmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/9/20 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel) (jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dale R. Rosner. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Chewning, Donald)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Dale R. Rosner. (Chewning, Donald)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Dale R. Rosner (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Appeals Council order, #3 Exhibit ALJ Decision)(Chewning, Donald)

    Read MoreRead Less