This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2022 at 08:22:51 (UTC).

Rosetto v. Jeffreys et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2022 Rosetto filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Jeffreys. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sue E. Myerscough and Tom Schanzle-Haskins. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-03035

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sue E. Myerscough

Referral Judge

Tom Schanzle-Haskins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Perry James Rosetto

Mt Sterling, IL 62353

Defendants

Rob Jeffreys

Justin Hammer

Glendal French

. Garbett

. Snell

K Smith

. Cox

. Myers

. Trusewych

. Settles

. Kimber

John Doe

Wexford Health Sources Inc

Brandon Edgar

. Ryan

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Cover Letter

1 #2

Envelope

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Perry James Rosetto.(KE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Perry James Rosetto. Responses due by 3/16/2022 (KE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#6

(#6) Letter from Plaintiff requesting copies of documents. (KE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Verification of Number of Pages of Complaint and Clarification of Responses due Regarding #5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Perry James Rosetto. Responses due by 3/29/2022. (MJC) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#8

(#8) JUDGMENT entered. (KE) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Reconsideration re Text Order, #8 Judgment by Plaintiff Perry James Rosetto. Responses due by 4/18/2022 (KE) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE to the Court regarding filings by Plaintiff Perry James Rosetto. (KE) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Exhibits

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402, receipt number 24626010527 (JMB) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Reconsideration re Text Order, #8 Judgment by Plaintiff Perry James Rosetto. Responses due by 4/21/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KE) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE to the Court regarding filings by Plaintiff Perry James Rosetto. (KE) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Reconsideration re Text Order, #8 Judgment by Plaintiff Perry James Rosetto. Responses due by 4/18/2022 (KE) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JUDGMENT entered. (KE) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 3/31/2022. The Court denied Plaintiff's petition to proceed in forma pauperis and directed him to pay the $402 filing fee by March 17, 2022. The Court admonished Plaintiff that noncompliance would result in the dismissal of his case. Plaintiff has not complied nor requested a timely extension to submit his payment. Accordingly, the Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's case without prejudice for not complying with the Court's Order. (KE) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Verification of Number of Pages of Complaint and Clarification of Responses due Regarding #5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Perry James Rosetto. Responses due by 3/29/2022. (MJC) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 3/3/2022. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #3 . Plaintiff's trust fund ledger #4 reflects an approximate average balance of over $1,100 for the past six months and a final balance of $1177 on February 7, 2022. Because Plaintiff had not shown that he is impoverished, Plaintiff is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within fourteen days of the entry of this order. See Merritte v. Templeton, 493 F. Appx 782, 784 (7th Cir. 2012) ("A litigant wishing to proceed in forma pauperis must show that he is unable to pay required filing fees."). Failure to comply will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice. (KE) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Plaintiff requesting copies of documents. (KE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Perry James Rosetto. Responses due by 3/16/2022 (KE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Perry James Rosetto. (KE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Perry James Rosetto.(KE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sue E Myerscough. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 3/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Perry James Rosetto. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(KE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Snell is a litigant

Latest cases where Settles is a litigant

Latest cases where MYERS is a litigant

Latest cases where Cox, A/K/A Mary Frances is a litigant