This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2021 at 09:39:26 (UTC).

Rosenthal, Cathi et al v. Air Methods Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 Rosenthal, Cathi filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against Air Methods Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00344

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hayden Rosenthal

Ascension Health

Kaylen Rosenthal

Cathi Rosenthal

Taylor Rosenthal

Tristan Rosenthal

Defendants

Air Methods Corporation

Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company

Not Yet Classified

Gregory Rosenthal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dale M Eaton

Attorney at Eaton John Overbey, LLP

513 Grant Street

Wausau, WI 54403

Daniel L. Overbey

Attorney at Eaton John Overbey Jackman, LLP

513 Grant Stree

Wausau, WI 54403

Defendant Attorneys

William James Katt

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP

Suite 600, 740 North Plankinton Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53203

Theodore J. Waldeck

Attorney at Waldeck & Woodrow

121 South 8Th Street, Suite 1400

Minneapolis, MN 54402

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Stipulation for Partial Dismissal by Defendant Air Methods Corporation. (Katt, William) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#10

(#10) Brief in Reply by Defendant Air Methods Corporation in Support of #5 Motion to Dismiss (Katt, William) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#9

(#9) Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Cathi Rosenthal, Hayden Rosenthal, Kaylen Rosenthal, Taylor Rosenthal, Tristan Rosenthal re: #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Air Methods Corporation (Eaton, Dale) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Air Methods Corporation. (Katt, William) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

7 #3

Exhibit C - NTSB Aviation Accident Factual Report

7 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Removal

7 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#7

(#7) Affidavit of Alex K. Silvola filed by Defendant Air Methods Corporation re: #5 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - NTSB Aviation Accident Factual Report) (Katt, William) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#6

(#6) Brief in Support of #5 Motion to Dismiss - Partial by Defendant Air Methods Corporation (Katt, William) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS - Partial by Defendant Air Methods Corporation. Brief in Opposition due 7/6/2021. Brief in Reply due 7/16/2021. (Katt, William) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#3

(#3) Stipulation for Extension of Time for Air Methods Corporation to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant Air Methods Corporation. (Katt, William) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Air Methods Corporation. (Katt, William) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

1 #3

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Signed Consent

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oneida County, case number 21-CV-57. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2878179), filed by Air Methods Corporation, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Interrogatories/Request for Production, #2 Exhibit B - Signed Consent, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Katt, William) Modified on 5/20/2021. (lak) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Stipulation for Partial Dismissal by Defendant Air Methods Corporation. (Katt, William) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Brief in Reply by Defendant Air Methods Corporation in Support of #5 Motion to Dismiss (Katt, William) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Cathi Rosenthal, Hayden Rosenthal, Kaylen Rosenthal, Taylor Rosenthal, Tristan Rosenthal re: #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Air Methods Corporation (Eaton, Dale) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSet Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Air Methods Corporation. (Katt, William) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Affidavit of Alex K. Silvola filed by Defendant Air Methods Corporation re: #5 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - NTSB Aviation Accident Factual Report) (Katt, William) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Brief in Support of #5 Motion to Dismiss - Partial by Defendant Air Methods Corporation (Katt, William) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS - Partial by Defendant Air Methods Corporation. Brief in Opposition due 7/6/2021. Brief in Reply due 7/16/2021. (Katt, William) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company answer due 6/18/2021. (voc) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order granting #3 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Air Methods Corporation to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/26/2021. (voc) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Stipulation for Extension of Time for Air Methods Corporation to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant Air Methods Corporation. (Katt, William) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCase non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related Case 21-cv-343-wmc. (jls) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Air Methods Corporation. (Katt, William) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oneida County, case number 21-CV-57. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2878179), filed by Air Methods Corporation, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Interrogatories/Request for Production, #2 Exhibit B - Signed Consent, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Katt, William) Modified on 5/20/2021. (lak) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ascension Healthcare is a litigant

Latest cases where AIR METHODS CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE CO is a litigant