This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:29:44 (UTC).

Rosenblatt v. Carbonite, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Rosenblatt filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Carbonite, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02234

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jordan Rosenblatt

Defendants

Coral Merger Sub Inc.

Linda Connly

Open Text Corporation

Carbonite, Inc.

Todd Krasnow

David Friend

Scott Daniels

Steve Munford

Marina Levinson

Charles Kane

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian D. Long

Attorney at Rigrodsky & Long, P.A.

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1220

Wilmington, DE 19801

Gina M. Serra

Attorney at Rigrodsky & Long, P.A.

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1220

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jordan Rosenblatt (Long, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff Certification

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 filed with Jury Demand against Carbonite, Inc., Linda Connly, Coral Merger Sub Inc., Scott Daniels, David Friend, Charles Kane, Todd Krasnow, Marina Levinson, Steve Munford, Open Text Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2794711.) - filed by Jordan Rosenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CLOSED per D.I. #3 . (nms) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jordan Rosenblatt (Long, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02234-RGA, 1:19-cv-02247-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (myr) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 filed with Jury Demand against Carbonite, Inc., Linda Connly, Coral Merger Sub Inc., Scott Daniels, David Friend, Charles Kane, Todd Krasnow, Marina Levinson, Steve Munford, Open Text Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2794711.) - filed by Jordan Rosenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.