This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2021 at 07:45:38 (UTC).

Rosen et al v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 Rosen filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William M. Ray, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00787

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Ray, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nicholas Rosen

Tamer Nassar

Reginald St. Jean

Defendants

Daimler AG

Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

G. Franklin Lemond, Jr.

Attorney at Webb, Klase & Lemond, LLC

Suite 480, 1900 The Exchange, Se

Atlanta, GA 30339

Matthew D. Schelkopf

Attorney at Sauder Schelkopf LLC

1109 Lancaster Avenue

Berwyn, PA 19312

Matthew C. Klase

Attorney at Webb, Klase & Lemond, LLC

Suite 480, 1900 The Exchange, Se

Atlanta, GA 30339

Edward Adam Webb

Attorney at Webb, Klase & Lemond, LLC

Suite 480, 1900 The Exchange, Se

Atlanta, GA 30339

Joseph B. Kenney

Attorney at Sauder Schelkopf

1109 Lancaster Ave

Berwyn, PA 19312

Steven G. Calamusa

Attorney at Gordon & Partners, PA

4114 Northlake Blvd.

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

Lori G. Kier

Attorney at Sauder Schelkopf

1109 Lancaster Ave

Berwyn, PA 19312

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen B. Devereaux

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP-ATL 40

40Th Floor, 1180 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Madison Hunter Kitchens

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP - ATL 36

36Th Floor, 1180 Peachtree St., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

19 #4

Exhibit C

19 #3

Exhibit B

19 #2

Exhibit A

19 #1

Brief

#19

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

RESTRICTED

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit -Cal. Civ. Code Sec. 1780(d) Declaration of N. Rosen)

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Madison Hunter Kitchens on behalf of Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Kitchens, Madison) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G. Calamusa on behalf of Nicholas Rosen (Calamusa, Steven) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Devereaux, Stephen) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing to Steven G. Calamusa re #18 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (cmd) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER GRANTING #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/13/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(cmd) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven G. Calamusa Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10888657). Attorney Steven G. Calamusa added appearing on behalf of Tamer Nassar, Nicholas Rosen, Reginald St. Jean (cdg) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPLICATION for Admission of Steven G. Calamusa Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10888657).by Tamer Nassar, Nicholas Rosen, Reginald St. Jean. (Klase, Matthew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING #14 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Associated Scheduling Deadlines and Page Limits. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's Answer due 4/22/2021. If MBUSA responds by motion, Plaintiff's response deadline is extended to 6/7/2021. MBUSA's reply brief deadline extended to 6/28/2021. MBUSA's MTD brief not to exceed 35 pages; Plaintiff's response not to exceed 35 pages; MBUSA's reply not to exceed 20 pages. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/18/2021. (cmd) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daimler North America Corporation, Other Affiliate Daimler AG, Other Affiliate Daimler International Nederland B.V. for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Devereaux, Stephen) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and Associated Scheduling Deadlines, Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Devereaux, Stephen) . Added MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and edited text on 3/18/2021. (cmd) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph B. Kenney Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10804258). with Brief In Support by Tamer Nassar, Nicholas Rosen, Reginald St. Jean. (Klase, Matthew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew D. Schelkopf Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10804237). with Brief In Support by Tamer Nassar, Nicholas Rosen, Reginald St. Jean. (Klase, Matthew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Matthew D. Schelkopf. Clerk to follow-up by 3/15/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Joseph B. Kenney. Clerk to follow-up by 3/15/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Lori G. Kier. Clerk to follow-up by 3/15/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed by Tamer Nassar, Reginald St. Jean, Nicholas Rosen. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Lemond, G.) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/24/2021. (cmd) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tamer Nassar, Reginald St. Jean and Nicholas Rosen. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10758564) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Cal. Civ. Code Sec. 1780(d) Declaration of N. Rosen), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAIMLER AG is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LORI G. KIER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Franklin Lemond Jr.