This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2021 at 09:27:38 (UTC).

Roselia De Leon et al v. Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 Roselia De Leon filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Estuardo A Reyes Trucking. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01337

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roselia De Leon

Ricardo Leon

Defendants

Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking

Estuardo Armando Reyes

Estuardo A. Reyes doing business as Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking

Does 1 to 25, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fred Hanassab

Attorney at Law Offices of Fred Hanassab

6320 Canoga Avenue Suite 790

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorneys

Krsto Mijanovic

Attorney at Haight Brown and Bonesteel LLP

555 South Flower Street 45Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jeffrey C. Schmid

Attorney at Haight Brown and Bonesteel LLP

555 South Flower Street 45Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Defendant Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking, Estuardo Armando Reyes. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Schmid, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (npo) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Shashi H. Kewalramani. New Case Number 5:21-cv-01337-JWH-SHKx. (car) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking, Estuardo Armando Reyes. Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Filing Answer #7 . (car) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 25, Inclusive, Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking, Estuardo Armando Reyes, Estuardo A. Reyes, filed by Plaintiffs Roselia De Leon, Ricardo Leon. Filed in State Court on 1/5/2021 Submitted with Attachment Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing Answer in State Court filed by Defendants Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking, Estuardo Armando Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schmid, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking, Estuardo Armando Reyes, identifying Roselia DeLeon, Ricardo Leon, Estuardo Armando Reyes, Estuardo Armando Reyes dba Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking. (Schmid, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendants Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking, Estuardo Armando Reyes.. (Schmid, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking, Estuardo Armando Reyes. (Schmid, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Cases filed by Defendants Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking, Estuardo Armando Reyes. (Schmid, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Jeffrey C. Schmid re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking, Estuardo Armando Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schmid, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVSB2101692 Receipt No: ACACDC-31759752 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Estuardo Armando Reyes, Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Jeffrey C. Schmid added to party Estuardo A. Reyes Trucking(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey C. Schmid added to party Estuardo Armando Reyes(pty:dft))(Schmid, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krsto Mijanovic