This case was last updated from PACER on 08/09/2020 at 10:23:46 (UTC).

ROSE v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 ROSE filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against WELLS FARGO BANK, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Tanya Walton Pratt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00127

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONALD ROSE

Defendants

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. D/B/A WELLS FARGO DEALER SERVICES

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

TRANS UNION, LLC

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC

PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY D/B/A FEDLOAN SERVICING CO.

PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL, LLC

PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY doing business as FEDLOAN SERVICING CO.

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. doing business as WELLS FARGO DEALER SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Hemminger

Attorney at HEMMINGER LAW OFFICE

331 Townepark Circle, Suite 100-C

Louisville, KY 40243

Defendant Attorneys

Peter Raymond Wickard

Attorney at SCHUCKIT & ASSOCIATES P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Sandra Davis Jansen

Attorney at SCHUCKIT & ASSOCIATES P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Jena M. Valdetero

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LEIGHTON PAISNER LLP

161 N. Clark Street, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60601

Matthew M. Petersen

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LEIGHTON PAISNER LLP

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 4100

Denver, CO 80203-4541

Mark D. Kundmueller

Attorney at TROUTMAN SANDERS LLP

222 Central Park Avenue, Suite 200

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY. (Petersen, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jena M. Valdetero on behalf of Defendant PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY. (Valdetero, Jena) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Petersen on behalf of Defendant PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY. (Petersen, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#12

(#12) Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses, filed by TRANS UNION, LLC.(Wickard, Peter) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the courts electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/13/2020.(TMC) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Kundmueller, Mark) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent WELLS FARGO & COMPANY for WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A... (Kundmueller, Mark) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Kundmueller on behalf of Defendant WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Kundmueller, Mark) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANS UNION, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TRANS UNION, LLC, Corporate Parent TRANSUNION INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS, INC., Other Affiliate T. ROWE PRICE GROUP, INC. for TRANS UNION, LLC.. (Wickard, Peter) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Raymond Wickard on behalf of Defendant TRANS UNION, LLC. (Wickard, Peter) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

1 #7

Proposed Summons Summons to Trans Union

1 #6

Proposed Summons Summons to Experian

1 #5

Proposed Summons Summons to Equifax

1 #4

Proposed Summons Summons to Fedloan

1 #3

Proposed Summons Summons to Pacific Union

1 #2

Proposed Summons Summons to Wells Fargo

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Verified against WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL, LLC, PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC , filed by DONALD ROSE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6025670) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons to Wells Fargo, #3 Proposed Summons Summons to Pacific Union, #4 Proposed Summons Summons to Fedloan, #5 Proposed Summons Summons to Equifax, #6 Proposed Summons Summons to Experian, #7 Proposed Summons Summons to Trans Union)(Hemminger, David) Modified on 6/11/2020 to edit text (TMC). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY. (Petersen, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jena M. Valdetero on behalf of Defendant PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY. (Valdetero, Jena) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Petersen on behalf of Defendant PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY. (Petersen, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses, filed by TRANS UNION, LLC.(Wickard, Peter) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the courts electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/13/2020.(TMC) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Kundmueller, Mark) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent WELLS FARGO & COMPANY for WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A... (Kundmueller, Mark) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Kundmueller on behalf of Defendant WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Kundmueller, Mark) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANS UNION, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TRANS UNION, LLC, Corporate Parent TRANSUNION INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS, INC., Other Affiliate T. ROWE PRICE GROUP, INC. for TRANS UNION, LLC.. (Wickard, Peter) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Raymond Wickard on behalf of Defendant TRANS UNION, LLC. (Wickard, Peter) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Davis Jansen on behalf of Defendant TRANS UNION, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued by Clerk as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL, LLC, PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY, TRANS UNION, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (TMC) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Hemminger on behalf of Plaintiff DONALD ROSE. (Hemminger, David) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Verified against WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL, LLC, PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC , filed by DONALD ROSE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6025670) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons to Wells Fargo, #3 Proposed Summons Summons to Pacific Union, #4 Proposed Summons Summons to Fedloan, #5 Proposed Summons Summons to Equifax, #6 Proposed Summons Summons to Experian, #7 Proposed Summons Summons to Trans Union)(Hemminger, David) Modified on 6/11/2020 to edit text (TMC). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant