This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2019 at 07:37:26 (UTC).

Rose v. Dallas County Texas et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 Rose filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Dallas County Texas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01240

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Calvin Rose

Defendants

L Lang

Dallas County Texas

J Garrison

S King

R Hamilton

S Castillo

Lupe Valdez

D Adams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott H Palmer

Attorney at Scott H Palmer PC

15455 Dallas Parkway, Suite 540 Lb 32

Addison, TX 75001

James Roberts

Attorney at Scott H Palmer PC

15455 Dallas Pkwy, Suite 540

Addison, TX 75001

Defendant Attorneys

John Butrus

Attorney at Dallas County District Attorney

Frank Crowly Courts Building, 113 N. Riverfront Blvd, Lb 19

Dallas, TX 75207

Barbara S Nicholas

Attorney at Dallas County District Attorney, Civil Division

411 Elm

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Calvin Rose re #13 Response/Objection to Dallas County's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Roberts, James) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

12 #4

Additional Page(s)

12 #3

Additional Page(s)

12 #2

Additional Page(s)

12 #1

Additional Page(s)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to S Castillo. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019; J Garrison. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019; R Hamilton. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019; S King. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019; Lupe Valdez. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s)) (Roberts, James). (Main Document 12, Attachments 1, 2, 3, 4 replaced with flattened images on 7/11/2019) (ajb). Modified sent date (ajb). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to L Lang. Waiver sent on 7/8/2019. (Roberts, James) (Main Document 11 replaced with flattened image on 7/11/2019) (ajb). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to D Adams. Waiver sent on 7/8/2019. (Roberts, James) (Main Document 10 replaced with flattened image on 7/11/2019) (ajb). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dallas County Texas. (Nicholas, Barbara) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Dallas County Texas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Nicholas, Barbara) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Extend Time filed by Dallas County Texas. Attorney Barbara S Nicholas added to party Dallas County Texas (pty:dft).(Nicholas, Barbara) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dallas County Texas, served on 5/24/2019. (mla) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to D Adams, S Castillo, Dallas County Texas, J Garrison, R Hamilton, S King, L Lang, Lupe Valdez. (zkc) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Calvin Rose. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10005031) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Roberts, James) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Calvin Rose re #13 Response/Objection to Dallas County's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Roberts, James) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE filed by Calvin Rose re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) (Roberts, James) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to S Castillo. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019; J Garrison. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019; R Hamilton. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019; S King. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019; Lupe Valdez. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s)) (Roberts, James). (Main Document 12, Attachments 1, 2, 3, 4 replaced with flattened images on 7/11/2019) (ajb). Modified sent date (ajb). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to L Lang. Waiver sent on 7/8/2019. (Roberts, James) (Main Document 11 replaced with flattened image on 7/11/2019) (ajb). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to D Adams. Waiver sent on 7/8/2019. (Roberts, James) (Main Document 10 replaced with flattened image on 7/11/2019) (ajb). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dallas County Texas. (Nicholas, Barbara) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Dallas County Texas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Nicholas, Barbara) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants response to the complaint is due July 1, 2019. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/12/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Extend Time filed by Dallas County Texas. Attorney Barbara S Nicholas added to party Dallas County Texas (pty:dft).(Nicholas, Barbara) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dallas County Texas, served on 5/24/2019. (mla) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to D Adams, S Castillo, Dallas County Texas, J Garrison, R Hamilton, S King, L Lang, Lupe Valdez. (zkc) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Calvin Rose. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Calvin Rose. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10005031) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Roberts, James) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Roberts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott H. Palmer