This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2022 at 08:09:33 (UTC).

ROSE v. CORNING INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 ROSE filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against CORNING INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOE L. WEBSTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00981

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREW ROSE

Defendant

CORNING INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARY MARTOCCIO

Attorney at SPIELBERGER LAW GROUP

4890 W. Kennedy Blvd., Ste. 950

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3201593.), filed by Andrew Rose. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MARTOCCIO, GARY) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANDREW ROSE. CORNING INCORPORATED waiver sent on 1/3/2022, answer due 3/4/2022. (MARTOCCIO, GARY) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#3

(#3) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant CORNING INCORPORATED, filed by ANDREW ROSE.(MARTOCCIO, GARY) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff ANDREW ROSE by ANDREW ROSE.(MARTOCCIO, GARY) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff ANDREW ROSE by ANDREW ROSE.(MARTOCCIO, GARY) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant CORNING INCORPORATED, filed by ANDREW ROSE.(MARTOCCIO, GARY) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANDREW ROSE. CORNING INCORPORATED waiver sent on 1/3/2022, answer due 3/4/2022. (MARTOCCIO, GARY) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3201593.), filed by Andrew Rose. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MARTOCCIO, GARY) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Corning Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary James Martoccio