This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 08:46:53 (UTC).

Rose-Holliday v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Rose-Holliday filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Zilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01249

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Zilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kamala Rose-Holliday, M.D.

Kamala Rose-Holliday

Defendant

Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melton L Crawford

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MEL CRAWFORD

9425 35Th Ave Ne, Ste C

Seattle, WA 98115

Defendant Attorney

Russell Scott Buhite

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART (SEA)

1201 Third Avenue, Ste 5150

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

10 #18

Exhibit 18

10 #17

Exhibit 17

10 #16

Exhibit 16

10 #14

Exhibit 14

10 #13

Exhibit 13

10 #12

Exhibit 12

10 #11

Exhibit 11

10 #10

Exhibit 10

10 #9

Exhibit 9

10 #8

Exhibit 8

10 #7

Exhibit 7

10 #6

Exhibit 6

10 #5

Exhibit 5

10 #4

Exhibit 4

10 #3

Exhibit 3

10 #2

Exhibit 2

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/6/2020, (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION of Russell S. Buhite filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/6/2020, (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendant to file a responsive pleading or motion is EXTENDED to 10/13/2020. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LH) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sun Life Financial Inc. for Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Russell Scott Buhite on behalf of Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/29/2020, (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada on 8/24/2020, filed by Plaintiff Kamala Rose-Holliday. (Crawford, Melton) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/16/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/30/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (RE) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketJudge Thomas S. Zilly added. (RE) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Receipt # AWAWDC-6540546) Attorney Melton L Crawford added to party Kamala Rose-Holliday, M.D.(pty:pla), filed by Kamala Rose-Holliday, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Crawford, Melton) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less