This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2020 at 08:22:31 (UTC).

Rose et al v. Lincoln Benefit Life Company

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Rose filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lincoln Benefit Life Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tony N. Leung and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-02260

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tony N. Leung

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Harris

Jenifer Harris

Kathryn Rose

Defendant

Lincoln Benefit Life Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob Patsch Harris

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron

200 South Sixth Street, Suite 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Richard D Snyder

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron, PA

200 S 6Th St Ste 4000

Mpls, MN 55402-1425

Defendant Attorneys

Kate Middleton

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Katherine Villanueva

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

One Logan Square, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Consent Form

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 04:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

6 #3

Exhibit(s) C

6 #2

Exhibit(s) B

6 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Lincoln Benefit Life Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Middleton, Kate) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kate L. Villanueva. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8199204 filed by Lincoln Benefit Life Company. (Middleton, Kate) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lincoln Benefit Life Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Middleton, Kate) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant Lincoln Benefit Life Company, by and through its undersigned attorneys, hereby represents that it is currently a wholly-owned subsidiary of LBL HoldCo Inc. (Middleton, Kate) Modified text on 10/30/2020 (MMG). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Ex. B

1 #1

Summons and Complaint Ex. A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8185380) filed by Lincoln Benefit Life Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Ex. A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Ex. B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Middleton, Kate) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • Docket(#9) (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. In recognition of the current efforts locally and nationally to protect persons from unnecessary potential exposure to COVID-19, the Pretrial Scheduling Conference in this case will be held by telephone. A call-in number will be provided by the Court. The parties are not required to conduct any applicable meet and confers in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/14/2020. (HAM) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 04:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Katherine Villanueva for Lincoln Benefit Life Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/9/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Lincoln Benefit Life Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Middleton, Kate) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kate L. Villanueva. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8199204 filed by Lincoln Benefit Life Company. (Middleton, Kate) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lincoln Benefit Life Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Middleton, Kate) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-2260 (SRN/TNL). (MKB) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant Lincoln Benefit Life Company, by and through its undersigned attorneys, hereby represents that it is currently a wholly-owned subsidiary of LBL HoldCo Inc. (Middleton, Kate) Modified text on 10/30/2020 (MMG). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8185380) filed by Lincoln Benefit Life Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Ex. A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Ex. B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Middleton, Kate) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lincoln Benefit Life Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate Middleton