This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2021 at 09:53:09 (UTC).

Rosati et al v. Rosati et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Rosati filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Rosati. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Kness. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07762

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Kness

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Rosati

William Rosati

Defendants

Anthony Rosati

Power Play Distributors, LLC

Rosati's Franchise Systems, Inc.

David Rosati

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian Douglas Sieve

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Jordan Mitchell Heinz

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Lisa Jeanne Santaniello

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 N. Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant Attorneys

Michael K Molzberger

Attorney at Schiff Hardin

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Kirstie Ann Brenson

Attorney at Schiff Hardin Llp

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Adam J. Diederich

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Dr, Suite 6600

Chicago, IL 60606

Paula J. Morency

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60605

Patrick Etchingham

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 N. Clark Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

Matthew Patrick Connelly

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 N. Clark, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

Cory D Anderson

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 N. Clark Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#3

#2

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 2/24/2021: Telephonic initial status hearing set for April 9, 2021 at 9:45 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Agreed motion for extension of time to answer #22 is granted. Defendants must answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before 3/16/2021. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION by Plaintiffs Michael Rosati, William Rosati for extension of time to file answer Agreed Motion for Extension of Time (Santaniello, Lisa) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Rosati, William Rosati. Rosati's Franchise Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 12/29/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Sieve, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anthony Rosati, David Rosati by Kirstie Ann Brenson (Brenson, Kirstie) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anthony Rosati, David Rosati by Adam J. Diederich (Diederich, Adam) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anthony Rosati, David Rosati by Michael K Molzberger (Molzberger, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anthony Rosati, David Rosati by Paula J. Morency (Morency, Paula) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Attorney Certification of Service of Lanham Act Mediation Materials by Power Play Distributors, LLC (Etchingham, Patrick) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Rosati, William Rosati. David Rosati waiver sent on 12/29/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Sieve, Brian) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Power Play Distributors, LLC by Matthew Patrick Connelly (Connelly, Matthew) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Attorney Lisa Santaniello's motion to appear pro hac vice #5 is granted. Mailed notice (ma,) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (gcy, ) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (gcy, ) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17784133. (Santaniello, Lisa) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Rosati, William Rosati by Brian Douglas Sieve (Sieve, Brian) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Rosati, William Rosati by Jordan Mitchell Heinz (Heinz, Jordan) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Heinz, Jordan) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Michael Rosati, William Rosati; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17783505. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Heinz, Jordan) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula J. Morency

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael K Molzberger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cory D. Anderson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Patrick Connelly