This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:40:11 (UTC).

Rosas v. Doll

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Rosas filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Doll. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Malachy E Mannion and DB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00289

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Malachy E Mannion

Referral Judge

DB

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sergio Calderon Rosas

York, PA 17402

Respondent

Clair Doll

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Joseph Terz

Attorney at US Attorney's Office, MDPA - Prisoner

228 Walnut Street. Suite 220, Po Box 11754

Harrisburg, PA 17108-1754

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

2 #1

Notice and Consent Form

#2

(#2) PRO SE LETTER issued; (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent Form)(ep) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#3

(#3) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 02/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Habeas Corpus))(lp) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

3 #1

IFP (Habeas Corpus)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Respondents to show cause w/in 21 days. Show Cause Response due by 4/26/2019.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/5/19. (bs) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Respondents to show cause w/in 21 days. Show Cause Response due by 4/26/2019.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/5/19. (bs) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Receipt of payment from SERGIO CALDERON ROSAS in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 3/18/2019. Receipt number 333064919 processed by aoswald. (jjs, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 02/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Habeas Corpus))(lp) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRO SE LETTER issued; (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent Form)(ep) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DEEMED FILED SEE ORDER DOC. 4 - PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Sergio Calderon Rosas.(ep) Modified on 4/5/2019 (bs). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.