This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2023 at 07:35:31 (UTC).

ROSAS v. CIRCLE K STORES, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 ROSAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CIRCLE K STORES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and M. Kendra Klump. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00070

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

M. Kendra Klump

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEYZA ROSAS

Defendant

CIRCLE K STORES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas George Alexiou

Defendant Attorneys

Brett James Geschke

Michelle L. Casper

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant CIRCLE K STORES, INC. . (Casper, Michelle) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas George Alexiou on behalf of Plaintiff NEYZA ROSAS. (Alexiou, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#10

(#10) Order Setting Initial Pretrial Conference - This case is assigned for an initial pretrial conference by telephone on March 20, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. (Eastern Time), before United States Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump on 2/22/2023. (DWH) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

9 #5

Exhibit State Court Record, Docket, Service Issued, Service Returned Served, Sum

9 #4

Exhibit April 30, 2022 Demand Letter

9 #3

Exhibit Couche-Tard Business Records

9 #2

Exhibit Affidavit of Scott Scharenberg

9 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint

#9

(#9) EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal from Johnson Superior Court 1 by CIRCLE K STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Scott Scharenberg, #3 Exhibit Couche-Tard Business Records, #4 Exhibit April 30, 2022 Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit State Court Record, Docket, Service Issued, Service Returned Served, Summons, Complaint)(Casper, Michelle) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Brett James Geschke hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Geschke, Brett) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson County Superior Court, case number 41D01-2211-CT-000157, filed by CIRCLE K STORES, INC.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7452509) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casper, Michelle) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant CIRCLE K STORES, INC. . (Casper, Michelle) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas George Alexiou on behalf of Plaintiff NEYZA ROSAS. (Alexiou, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order Setting Initial Pretrial Conference - This case is assigned for an initial pretrial conference by telephone on March 20, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. (Eastern Time), before United States Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump on 2/22/2023. (DWH) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal from Johnson Superior Court 1 by CIRCLE K STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Scott Scharenberg, #3 Exhibit Couche-Tard Business Records, #4 Exhibit April 30, 2022 Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit State Court Record, Docket, Service Issued, Service Returned Served, Summons, Complaint)(Casper, Michelle) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Brett James Geschke hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Geschke, Brett) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant Mac Convenience Stores, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by CIRCLE K STORES, INC..(Casper, Michelle) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett James Geschke on behalf of Defendant CIRCLE K STORES, INC. (Geschke, Brett) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by CIRCLE K STORES, INC. (Casper, Michelle) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L. Casper on behalf of Defendant CIRCLE K STORES, INC. (Casper, Michelle) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson County Superior Court, case number 41D01-2211-CT-000157, filed by CIRCLE K STORES, INC.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7452509) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casper, Michelle) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less