This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:28:15 (UTC).

Rosario v. Straight Line Source Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Rosario filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Straight Line Source Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gary R. Brown and Arlene R. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00102

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary R. Brown

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jasmine Rosario

Defendants

Ali Habib Mayar

Straight Line Source Inc.

Dimitrios Tsikis

Platinum Rapid Funding Group Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emre Polat

Attorney at Polat Law Group, PLLC

45 Broadway, Ste 1420

New York, NY 10006

Defendant Attorneys

David J. Grech

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

1 Battery Park Plaza, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Lindsey Blackwell

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani

1 Battery Park Plaza, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Jonathan L. Adler

Attorney at Stein Adler Dabah Zelkowitz LLP

1633 Broadway, 46Th Floor, 10019

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and/or Motion or Other Response re #1 Complaint, by Ali Habib Mayar, Straight Line Source Inc., Dimitrios Tsikis. (Grech, David) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Adler on behalf of Platinum Rapid Funding Group Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Adler, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Grech on behalf of Ali Habib Mayar, Straight Line Source Inc., Dimitrios Tsikis (aty to be noticed) (Grech, David) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Blackwell on behalf of Ali Habib Mayar, Straight Line Source Inc., Dimitrios Tsikis (aty to be noticed) (Blackwell, Lindsey) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#20

(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jasmine Rosario. Dimitrios Tsikis served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Polat, Emre) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#19

(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jasmine Rosario. Ali Habib Mayar served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Polat, Emre) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#18

(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jasmine Rosario. Platinum Rapid Funding Group Ltd. served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Polat, Emre) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#17

(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jasmine Rosario. Straight Line Source Inc. served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Polat, Emre) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#16

(#16) Summons Issued as to Dimitrios Tsikis. (Tirado, Chelsea) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Jasmine Rosario (Polat, Emre) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

1 #5

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#24) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and/or Motion or Other Response re #1 Complaint, by Ali Habib Mayar, Straight Line Source Inc., Dimitrios Tsikis. (Grech, David) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer The time for all Defendants to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby extended to and including April 20, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/14/2020. (Jacobwitz, Beth) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and/or Motion or Other Response re #1 Complaint, by Ali Habib Mayar, Straight Line Source Inc., Dimitrios Tsikis. (Grech, David) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Adler on behalf of Platinum Rapid Funding Group Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Adler, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Grech on behalf of Ali Habib Mayar, Straight Line Source Inc., Dimitrios Tsikis (aty to be noticed) (Grech, David) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Blackwell on behalf of Ali Habib Mayar, Straight Line Source Inc., Dimitrios Tsikis (aty to be noticed) (Blackwell, Lindsey) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jasmine Rosario. Dimitrios Tsikis served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Polat, Emre) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jasmine Rosario. Ali Habib Mayar served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Polat, Emre) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jasmine Rosario. Platinum Rapid Funding Group Ltd. served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Polat, Emre) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jasmine Rosario. Straight Line Source Inc. served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Polat, Emre) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Summons Issued as to Dimitrios Tsikis. (Tirado, Chelsea) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons. by Jasmine Rosario (Polat, Emre) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. by Jasmine Rosario (Polat, Emre) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. by Jasmine Rosario (Polat, Emre) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketProposed summonses are rejected; the section that reads "The answer or motion must be served on plaintiff or plaintiff's attorney, whose name and address are:" has not been completed; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Jasmine Rosario (Polat, Emre) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The second page of the Civil Cover Sheet is missing. The current 2 page document can be found on the court's website. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $400, receipt number BNYEDC-12221799, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Jasmine Rosario. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Polat, Emre) Modified on 1/8/2020 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.