Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 04:22:08 (UTC).

Rosario et al v. Joovy Holding Co. et al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 Rosario filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Joovy Holding Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ursula Ungaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-24356

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ursula Ungaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Melissa Rosario

Christian Rosario

Defendants

Amazon.com, Inc.

Joovy, LLC

Joovy Holding Co.

Amazon.com Services, Inc.

Amazon.com Services, Inc. a Washington Corporation formerly doing business as Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ricardo M. Martinez-Cid

Podhurst Orseck, P.A., Suntrust International Center, 1 Se Third Avenue, Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Lea Pilar Bucciero

Podhurst Orseck, P.A., Suntrust International Center, 1 Se Third Avenue, Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Lea P. Bucciero

Podhurst Orsek, P.A., One Se Third Avenue, Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole Danielle Duga Walsh

Attorney at Hill Ward Henderson

101 E. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

Robert Maurice Fulton

Attorney at Hill Ward & Henderson

101 E Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 3700 Po Box 2231

Tampa, FL 33601

Cory J. Person

Attorney at Hill, Ward & Henderson, P.A.

Post Office Box 2231

Tampa, FL 33601

Jennise Acosta

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood , Boyer, P.A.

9300 South Dadeland Boulevard, 4Th Floor

Miami, FL 33156

Reginald John Clyne

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A.

9300 South Dadeland Blvd., 4Th Floor

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Joovy Holding Co., Joovy, LLC re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) filed by Joovy Holding Co., Joovy, LLC (Acosta, Jennise) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

22 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#22

(#22) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Christian Rosario, Melissa Rosario (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#21

(#21) Order Vacating #18 Order. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) filed by Joovy Holding Co., Joovy, LLC. ( Responses due by 1/20/2020); granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion for Leave to Issue Discovery in Advance of the Parties' Rule 26 Conference. Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference is re-set to 2/7/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/6/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2019 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#15

(#15) Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by Christian Rosario, Melissa Rosario. Responses due by 11/22/2019 (Martinez-Cid, Ricardo) Modified Relief on 11/14/2019 (ls). Added MOTION for Leave to Issue Discovery in Advance of the Parties' Rule 26 Conference on 11/14/2019 (ls). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

13 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Robert P. Gardner

#13

(#15) Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by Christian Rosario, Melissa Rosario. Responses due by 11/22/2019 (Martinez-Cid, Ricardo) Modified Relief on 11/14/2019 (ls). Added MOTION for Leave to Issue Discovery in Advance of the Parties' Rule 26 Conference on 11/14/2019 (ls). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennise Acosta on behalf of Joovy Holding Co., Joovy, LLC. Attorney Jennise Acosta added to party Joovy Holding Co. (pty:dft), Attorney Jennise Acosta added to party Joovy, LLC(pty:dft). (Acosta, Jennise) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reginald John Clyne on behalf of Joovy Holding Co., Joovy, LLC. Attorney Reginald John Clyne added to party Joovy Holding Co. (pty:dft), Attorney Reginald John Clyne added to party Joovy, LLC(pty:dft). (Clyne, Reginald) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#6

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #6 Order to Answer,, Set Answer Due Deadline, by Joovy Holding Co., Joovy, LLC. (Acosta, Jennise) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#5

(#5) Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#4

(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Lea P. Bucciero and Cory J. Person, mailing date October 23, 2019, (pt) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#15) Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by Christian Rosario, Melissa Rosario. Responses due by 11/22/2019 (Martinez-Cid, Ricardo) Modified Relief on 11/14/2019 (ls). Added MOTION for Leave to Issue Discovery in Advance of the Parties' Rule 26 Conference on 11/14/2019 (ls). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Joovy Holding Co., Joovy, LLC re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) filed by Joovy Holding Co., Joovy, LLC (Acosta, Jennise) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Christian Rosario, Melissa Rosario (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Martinez-Cid, Ricardo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Order Vacating #18 Order. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Reset Hearings Scheduling Conference re-set for 2/7/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. (ls) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) filed by Joovy Holding Co., Joovy, LLC. ( Responses due by 1/20/2020); granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion for Leave to Issue Discovery in Advance of the Parties' Rule 26 Conference. Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference is re-set to 2/7/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Clerks Notice to Filer re #15 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Joovy Holding Co. and Joovy, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Leave to Issue Discovery in Advance of the Parties. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. AND Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/6/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2019 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/6/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE by Christian Rosario, Melissa Rosario re #15 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Joovy Holding Co. and Joovy, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Leave to Issue Discovery in Advance of the Parties (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Martinez-Cid, Ricardo) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by Christian Rosario, Melissa Rosario. Responses due by 11/22/2019 (Martinez-Cid, Ricardo) Modified Relief on 11/14/2019 (ls). Added MOTION for Leave to Issue Discovery in Advance of the Parties' Rule 26 Conference on 11/14/2019 (ls). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #6 Order to Answer,, Set Answer Due Deadline, by Joovy Holding Co., Joovy, LLC. (Acosta, Jennise) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennise Acosta on behalf of Joovy Holding Co., Joovy, LLC. Attorney Jennise Acosta added to party Joovy Holding Co. (pty:dft), Attorney Jennise Acosta added to party Joovy, LLC(pty:dft). (Acosta, Jennise) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reginald John Clyne on behalf of Joovy Holding Co., Joovy, LLC. Attorney Reginald John Clyne added to party Joovy Holding Co. (pty:dft), Attorney Reginald John Clyne added to party Joovy, LLC(pty:dft). (Clyne, Reginald) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO ANSWER, Amazon.com Services, Inc. response due 10/29/2019; Amazon.com, Inc. response due 10/29/2019; Joovy Holding Co. response due 11/6/2019; Joovy, LLC response due 11/6/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Lea P. Bucciero and Cory J. Person, mailing date October 23, 2019, (pt) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12085961, filed by Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Walsh, Nicole) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lea Pilar Bucciero

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ricardo Manoel Martinez-Cid