This case was last updated from PACER on 07/26/2020 at 12:21:55 (UTC).

Gabriela Rosario v. 11343 Penrose Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 Gabriela Rosario filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against 11343 Penrose Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04715

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GABRIELA ROSARIO

Petitioner

Does 4-10

Defendants

CHAVIRA CINDY

Doe Managers 1-3

11343 PENROSE INC. dba LA VIDA GENTLEMENS CLUB

Doe Managers

Cindy Chavira

Does 4-10, inclusive

11343 Penrose Inc. doing business as La Vida Gentlemens Club

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John P Kristensen

Attorney at Kristensen LLP

12540 Beatrice Street Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90066

Jesenia Anahy Martinez

Attorney at Kristensen LLP

12540 Beatrice Street Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90066

Jacob Joseph Ventura

Attorney at Kristensen LLP

12540 Beatrice Street Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90066

Defendant Attorney

Ernest J Franceschi, Jr

Attorney at Franceschi Law Corporation

4660 Admiralty Way 5Th Floor

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cindy Chavira answer now due 8/6/2020, filed by Defendant Cindy Chavira.(Attorney Ernest J Franceschi, Jr added to party Cindy Chavira (pty:dft))(Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#14

(#14) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to 11343 Penrose Inc. answer now due 8/6/2020, filed by Defendant 11343 Penrose Inc..(Attorney Ernest J Franceschi, Jr added to party 11343 Penrose Inc.(pty:dft))(Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

13 #1

Exhibit 1

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gabriela Rosario, upon Defendant 11343 Penrose Inc. served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process Cindy Chavira in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kristensen, John) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gabriela Rosario, upon Defendant Cindy Chavira served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kristensen, John) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#11

(#11) DECLARATION of John P. Kristensen Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Gabriela Rosario. (Kristensen, John) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant 11343 Penrose Inc. (car) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#5

(#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff GABRIELA ROSARIO, (Kristensen, John) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff GABRIELA ROSARIO. (Kristensen, John) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff GABRIELA ROSARIO. (Kristensen, John) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GABRIELA ROSARIO. (Kristensen, John) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

1 #1

Consent Form For Wage Claim for Gabriela Rosario

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cindy Chavira answer now due 8/6/2020, filed by Defendant Cindy Chavira.(Attorney Ernest J Franceschi, Jr added to party Cindy Chavira (pty:dft))(Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to 11343 Penrose Inc. answer now due 8/6/2020, filed by Defendant 11343 Penrose Inc..(Attorney Ernest J Franceschi, Jr added to party 11343 Penrose Inc.(pty:dft))(Franceschi, Ernest) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gabriela Rosario, upon Defendant 11343 Penrose Inc. served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process Cindy Chavira in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kristensen, John) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gabriela Rosario, upon Defendant Cindy Chavira served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kristensen, John) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DECLARATION of John P. Kristensen Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Gabriela Rosario. (Kristensen, John) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. [See Order for details.] (et) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant 11343 Penrose Inc. (car) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Cindy Chavira. (car) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff GABRIELA ROSARIO, (Kristensen, John) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff GABRIELA ROSARIO. (Kristensen, John) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff GABRIELA ROSARIO. (Kristensen, John) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GABRIELA ROSARIO. (Kristensen, John) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26585071 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff GABRIELA ROSARIO. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form For Wage Claim for Gabriela Rosario) (Attorney John P Kristensen added to party GABRIELA ROSARIO(pty:pla))(Kristensen, John) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 11343 PENROSE INC. dba LA VIDA GENTLEMENS CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ernest J Franceschi, Jr