This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2019 at 07:08:56 (UTC).

ROSADO v. KENT PRECISION FOODS GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 07/29/2019 ROSADO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against KENT PRECISION FOODS GROUP INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02834

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Daniel Rosado

Defendants

Kent Precisions Foods Group, Inc.

KENT PRECISIONS FOODS GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GARY EUGENE SMITH

Attorney at GARY E SMITH PC - DALLAS TX

1401 Burnham Drive

Plano, TX 75093

Defendant Attorney

ADAM JOSEPH TW WHITE

Attorney at EMMANUEL SHEPPARD & CONDON - PENSACOLA FL

30 S Spring St

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by KENT PRECISIONS FOODS GROUP INC. (WHITE, ADAM) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#7

(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/5/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/7/2019. Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/22/2019. (MB) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#6

(#6) Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #1 Complaint by KENT PRECISIONS FOODS GROUP INC. (WHITE, ADAM) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Kent Precision Foods Group, Inc. (alb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE Summons for Kent Precision Foods Group, Inc. by Daniel Rosado re #1 Complaint (SMITH, GARY) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Kent Precisions Foods Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4569137.), filed by Daniel Rosado. (SMITH, GARY) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by KENT PRECISIONS FOODS GROUP INC. (WHITE, ADAM) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/5/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/7/2019. Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/22/2019. (MB) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Answer to Complaint (please see proposed ISO). (MB) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #1 Complaint by KENT PRECISIONS FOODS GROUP INC. (WHITE, ADAM) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Kent Precision Foods Group, Inc. (alb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#4) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Pursuant to N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet is required in each civil case filed. Please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings," "Other Documents." (alb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#3) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE Summons for Kent Precision Foods Group, Inc. by Daniel Rosado re #1 Complaint (SMITH, GARY) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Kent Precisions Foods Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4569137.), filed by Daniel Rosado. (SMITH, GARY) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less