This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2021 at 08:42:43 (UTC).

Rosado v. Greystone Property Management Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Rosado filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Greystone Property Management Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are William L. Campbell, Jr and Jeffery S. Frensley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00723

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

Referral Judge

Jeffery S. Frensley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Manuel Rosado

Defendant

Greystone Property Management Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David W. Garrison

Attorney at Barrett Johnston Martin & Garrison, LLC

414 Union Street, Suite 900

Nashville, TN 37219

Joshua A. Frank

Attorney at Barrett Johnston Martin & Garrison, LLC

414 Union Street, Suite 900

Nashville, TN 37219

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey B. Hardie

Attorney at Hunton & Williams

1751 Pinnacle Drive, Suite 1700

Mclean, VA 22102

Richard C. Paul

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP (Memphis Office)

999 Shady Grove Road, Suite 110

Memphis, TN 38120

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER: MOTION #12 to Reset Initial Case Management Conference GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to November 30, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/5/2021. (ln) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Manuel Rosado re #12 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Initial Case Management Conference (Garrison, David) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION to Reset Initial Case Management Conference by Manuel Rosado. (Garrison, David) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

10 #2

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

10 #1

Attachment Hardie Statement in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#10

(#10) MOTION for attorney Jeffrey B. Hardie to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3473287) by Greystone Property Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Hardie Statement in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Paul, Richard) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#9

(#9) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Greystone Property Management Corporation. (Paul, Richard) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Greystone Property Management Corporation.(Paul, Richard) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Manuel Rosado. Greystone Property Management Corporation served on 10/5/2021. (Garrison, David) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons issued as to Greystone Property Management Corporation. Service copies will be returned to counsel (David Garrison) by regular mail. (ln) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 11/9/2021 at 8:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketReset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 11/30/2021 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: MOTION #12 to Reset Initial Case Management Conference GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to November 30, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/5/2021. (ln) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Manuel Rosado re #12 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Initial Case Management Conference (Garrison, David) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#12 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not sign the certificate of service. Please FILE a CONFORMED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for this document. (ln) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION to Reset Initial Case Management Conference by Manuel Rosado. (Garrison, David) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Jeffrey B. Hardie to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/27/2021. (lh) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for attorney Jeffrey B. Hardie to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3473287) by Greystone Property Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Hardie Statement in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Paul, Richard) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Jeffrey B. Hardie: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/15/2021. (ln) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketVA State Bar status verified as active for Jeffrey B. Hardie not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Richard C. Paul admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Greystone Property Management Corporation. (Paul, Richard) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Greystone Property Management Corporation.(Paul, Richard) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Manuel Rosado. Greystone Property Management Corporation served on 10/5/2021. (Garrison, David) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons issued as to Greystone Property Management Corporation. Service copies will be returned to counsel (David Garrison) by regular mail. (ln) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 11/9/2021 at 8:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for David W. Garrison and Joshua A. Frank admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ln) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Greystone Property Management Corporation (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3449510) filed by Manuel Rosado. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less