This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/10/2023 at 07:57:17 (UTC).

ROSA-PHILLIPS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFEC

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 ROSA-PHILLIPS filed an Other lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFEC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN F MURPHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00084

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN F MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANCIA ROSA-PHILLIPS

Defendant

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFEC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEONARD K. HILL

SUSAN B. AYRES

Defendant Attorney

MARK J. SHERER

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #3

Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit 2 State Court Docket

#2

(#2) MOTION to Vacate State Court Order and Dismiss the Petition filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFEC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Petition and Exhibits), #2 Exhibit 2 (Letter re Disbursements by Government), #3 Exhibit 3 (State Court Order), #4 Exhibit 4 (State Court Docket))(SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

2 #1

Exhibit 1 (State Court Petition and Exhibits)

2 #2

Exhibit 2 (Letter re Disbursements by Government)

2 #3

Exhibit 3 (State Court Order)

2 #4

Exhibit 4 (State Court Docket)

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA TO HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/31/23. 1/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANT U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFECS MOTION TO VACATE STATE COURT ORDER AND DISMISS THE PETITION #2 NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 17, 2023; NOTING THAT NO RESPONSE HAS BEEN FILED TO THE MOTION, AND THERE IS NO OTHER SIGN THAT PLAINTIFF IS PURSUING THIS CASE, PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CASE SHOULDNT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 17, 2023; AND, THE COURT MAY DISMISS THIS ACTION IF PLAINTIFF TAKES NO FURTHER ACTION BEFORE FEBRUARY 17, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 2/10/23. 2/10/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Vacate State Court Order and Dismiss the Petition filed by STANCIA ROSA-PHILLIPS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(AYRES, SUSAN) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibits

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Support re #2 MOTION to Vacate State Court Order and Dismiss the Petition filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFEC. (SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Support re #2 MOTION to Vacate State Court Order and Dismiss the Petition filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFEC. (SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Vacate State Court Order and Dismiss the Petition filed by STANCIA ROSA-PHILLIPS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(AYRES, SUSAN) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANT U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFECS MOTION TO VACATE STATE COURT ORDER AND DISMISS THE PETITION #2 NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 17, 2023; NOTING THAT NO RESPONSE HAS BEEN FILED TO THE MOTION, AND THERE IS NO OTHER SIGN THAT PLAINTIFF IS PURSUING THIS CASE, PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CASE SHOULDNT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 17, 2023; AND, THE COURT MAY DISMISS THIS ACTION IF PLAINTIFF TAKES NO FURTHER ACTION BEFORE FEBRUARY 17, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 2/10/23. 2/10/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA TO HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/31/23. 1/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Docket(#3) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (fdc) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Vacate State Court Order and Dismiss the Petition filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFEC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Petition and Exhibits), #2 Exhibit 2 (Letter re Disbursements by Government), #3 Exhibit 3 (State Court Order), #4 Exhibit 4 (State Court Docket))(SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U. S. Dept. of Labor from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 201000559., filed by U. S. Dept. of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 State Court Docket)(SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less