2:23-CV-00084
01/09/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Other
JOHN F MURPHY
STANCIA ROSA-PHILLIPS
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFEC
LEONARD K. HILL
SUSAN B. AYRES
MARK J. SHERER
Main Document
Civil Cover Sheet
Designation Form
Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint
Exhibit 2 State Court Docket
(#2) MOTION to Vacate State Court Order and Dismiss the Petition filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFEC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Petition and Exhibits), #2 Exhibit 2 (Letter re Disbursements by Government), #3 Exhibit 3 (State Court Order), #4 Exhibit 4 (State Court Docket))(SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 01/10/2023)
Exhibit 1 (State Court Petition and Exhibits)
Exhibit 2 (Letter re Disbursements by Government)
Exhibit 3 (State Court Order)
Exhibit 4 (State Court Docket)
(#4) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA TO HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/31/23. 1/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 01/31/2023)
(#5) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANT U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFECS MOTION TO VACATE STATE COURT ORDER AND DISMISS THE PETITION #2 NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 17, 2023; NOTING THAT NO RESPONSE HAS BEEN FILED TO THE MOTION, AND THERE IS NO OTHER SIGN THAT PLAINTIFF IS PURSUING THIS CASE, PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CASE SHOULDNT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 17, 2023; AND, THE COURT MAY DISMISS THIS ACTION IF PLAINTIFF TAKES NO FURTHER ACTION BEFORE FEBRUARY 17, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 2/10/23. 2/10/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 02/10/2023)
(#6) RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Vacate State Court Order and Dismiss the Petition filed by STANCIA ROSA-PHILLIPS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(AYRES, SUSAN) (Entered: 02/21/2023)
Exhibit Exhibits
(#7) RESPONSE in Support re #2 MOTION to Vacate State Court Order and Dismiss the Petition filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFEC. (SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Support re #2 MOTION to Vacate State Court Order and Dismiss the Petition filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFEC. (SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Vacate State Court Order and Dismiss the Petition filed by STANCIA ROSA-PHILLIPS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(AYRES, SUSAN) (Entered: 02/21/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANT U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFECS MOTION TO VACATE STATE COURT ORDER AND DISMISS THE PETITION #2 NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 17, 2023; NOTING THAT NO RESPONSE HAS BEEN FILED TO THE MOTION, AND THERE IS NO OTHER SIGN THAT PLAINTIFF IS PURSUING THIS CASE, PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE CASE SHOULDNT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 17, 2023; AND, THE COURT MAY DISMISS THIS ACTION IF PLAINTIFF TAKES NO FURTHER ACTION BEFORE FEBRUARY 17, 2023. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 2/10/23. 2/10/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 02/10/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA TO HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/31/23. 1/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 01/31/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (fdc) (Entered: 01/18/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) MOTION to Vacate State Court Order and Dismiss the Petition filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR OWCP/DFEC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Petition and Exhibits), #2 Exhibit 2 (Letter re Disbursements by Government), #3 Exhibit 3 (State Court Order), #4 Exhibit 4 (State Court Docket))(SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 01/10/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U. S. Dept. of Labor from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 201000559., filed by U. S. Dept. of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 State Court Docket)(SHERER, MARK) (Entered: 01/09/2023)
[-] Read Less