This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:23:59 (UTC).

Rosa et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Rosa filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01988

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Clark

Aliana Rosa

Defendants

American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.

Washington Water Restoration Inc.

American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI

Washington Water Restoration Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Isaac Ruiz

Attorney at PLAINTIFF LITIGATION GROUP PLLC

95 S Jackson St, Ste 100

Seattle, WA 98104

Kathryn M Knudsen

Attorney at PLAINTIFF LITIGATION GROUP PLLC

95 S Jackson St, Ste 100

Seattle, WA 98104

Defendant Attorneys

Rory W Leid, III

Attorney at COLE WATHEN LEID HALL PC

1505 Westlake Ave N Ste 700

Seattle, WA 98109

Jeremy Muth

Attorney at COLE WATHEN LEID HALL PC

1505 Westlake Ave N Ste 700

Seattle, WA 98109

Ryan J. Hesselgesser

Attorney at FORSBERG & UMLAUF (SEA)

901 5Th Ave, Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98164-1039

Carl Edward Forsberg

Attorney at FORSBERG & UMLAUF (SEA)

901 5Th Ave, Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98164-1039

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 1/27/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/13/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/21/2020. (LC) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE, by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI, to #7 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Muth, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#11

(#11) REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs David Clark, Aliana Rosa, TO RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand (Knudsen, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiffs David Clark, Aliana Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/10/2020, (Knudsen, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI (Muth, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs David Clark, Aliana Rosa (Ruiz, Isaac) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #9

Exhibit 8

#3

(#3) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Washington Water Restoration Inc (Hesselgesser, Ryan) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#12

(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 8. (Leid, Rory) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

1 #8

Exhibit 7

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez: Length of Trial: *8 days*. Jury Trial is set for 2/1/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 2/26/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 2/26/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/5/2020, Motions due by 9/4/2020, Discovery completed by 10/5/2020, Dispositive motions due by 11/3/2020, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 12/18/2020, Motions in Limine due by 1/4/2021, Pretrial Order due by 1/20/2021, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/27/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/27/2021.. (LC) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit A-C

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI (Muth, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#8

(#8) DECLARATION of Kathryn M. Knudsen filed by Plaintiffs David Clark, Aliana Rosa re #7 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Knudsen, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez: Length of Trial: *8 days*. Jury Trial is set for 2/1/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 2/26/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 2/26/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/5/2020, Motions due by 9/4/2020, Discovery completed by 10/5/2020, Dispositive motions due by 11/3/2020, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 12/18/2020, Motions in Limine due by 1/4/2021, Pretrial Order due by 1/20/2021, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/27/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/27/2021.. (LC) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 8. (Leid, Rory) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs David Clark, Aliana Rosa, TO RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand (Knudsen, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE, by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI, to #7 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Muth, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 1/27/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/13/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/21/2020. (LC) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLARATION of Kathryn M. Knudsen filed by Plaintiffs David Clark, Aliana Rosa re #7 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Knudsen, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiffs David Clark, Aliana Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/10/2020, (Knudsen, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Washington Water Restoration Inc (Hesselgesser, Ryan) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI (Muth, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI (Muth, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendants must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/16/2019. (CDA) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketJudge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (CDA) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs David Clark, Aliana Rosa (Ruiz, Isaac) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-15482-9; (Receipt # 0981-6039326), filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Muth, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.